This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 05:43:56 (UTC).

Ayala-Monroy v. Barr

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Ayala-Monroy filed an Other lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-9626

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEDRO AYALA-MONROY

Jackson, WY 83002

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pedro Ayala-Monroy

P.O. Box 13024

Jackson, WY 83002

Respondent Attorneys

Elizabeth Robyn Chapman

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

Lansing W. Tyler

Attorney at DHS Immigration and Customs Enforcement

12445 East Caley Avenue, Jim Bailey Building

Centennial, CO 80111

DOH/EOIR/BIA

Attorney at Attn: Certification Unit

P.O. Box 8530

Falls Church, VA 22041

Oil Oil

Attorney at Department of Justice

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

Petition for Review Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10787744] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elizabeth Robyn Chapman for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 11/20/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-9626] [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket[10787735] Entry of appearance submitted by Elizabeth R. Chapman for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/20/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-9626]--[Edited 11/20/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 11/20/2020] ERC [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10787652] Petition for review filed. Served on 11/20/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, General Counsel, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 11/20/2020 letter. Fee pd:Check #: money order, Receipt #: TBD, Amount: $ $500. Agency record due 12/30/2020 for William P. Barr.. Notice of appearance due on 12/21/2020 for Pedro Ayala-Monroy, and Notice of appearance due on 12/04/2020 for William P. Barr [20-9626] [Entered: 11/20/2020 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less