This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 04:23:36 (UTC).

Axon v. Florida's Natural Growers, Inc

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Axon filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Florida's Natural Growers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-203

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Florida's Natural Growers, Inc.

Citrus World, Inc

Plaintiff / Appellant

Alexandra Axon, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christina Yachiyo Taylor Esq.

Attorney at Latham, Shuker, Eden & Beaudine, LLP

111 North Magnolia Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801

Daniel Howard Coultoff Esq.

Attorney at Latham, Shuker, Eden & Beaudine, LLP

111 North Magnolia Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801

Tom M. Fini Esq.

Attorney at Catafago Fini LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kim E. Richman Esq.

Attorney at Richman Law Group

81 Prospect Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Clark Andrew Binkley Esq.

Attorney at Richman Law Group

8 West 126Th Street

New York, NY 10027

 

Court Documents

#43

No Description Available

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2479120] [19-203] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:37 AM]

#59

(#59) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/12/2019, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2607889] [19-203] [Entered: 07/12/2019 05:56 PM]

8 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#55

(#55) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/08/2019, on behalf of Appellee Citrus World, Inc and Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 07/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2602283] [19-203] [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:36 PM]

#36

No Description Available

#50

(#50) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. Service date 06/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2583642] [19-203] [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:02 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#44

(#44) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Kim E. Richman, Esq. for Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2555811] [19-203] [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:35 PM]

#18

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#13

No Description Available

#38

No Description Available

#9

(#10) ATTORNEY, Christina Yachiyo Taylor for Florida's Natural Growers, Inc. Citrus World, Inc, in case 19-203 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2483325] [19-203] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:01 PM]

#12

(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. Service date 02/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2491069] [19-203] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:15 PM]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/12/2019, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2607889] [19-203] [Entered: 07/12/2019 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 28(j) LETTER[ # 55 ], on behalf of Appellee Citrus World, Inc and Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., FILED.[2602337] [19-203] [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/08/2019, on behalf of Appellee Citrus World, Inc and Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 07/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2602283] [19-203] [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter[53], on behalf of Appellee Citrus World, Inc and Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., FILED.[2602240] [19-203] [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#53) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citrus World, Inc and Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., in re: FRAP 28(j), RECEIVED. Service date 07/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2602220] [19-203]--[Edited 07/08/2019 by JW] [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#52) CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/23/2019, PANEL A, PROPOSED.[2587046] [19-203] [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ATTORNEY, Clark Andrew Binkley for Alexandra Axon, in case 19-203 , [ # 50 ], ADDED.[2583862] [19-203] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. Service date 06/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2583642] [19-203] [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citrus World, Inc and Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., in re: advising Court of dates counsel cannot argue, RECEIVED. Service date 06/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2582479] [19-203]--[Edited 06/07/2019 by JW] [Entered: 06/07/2019 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Kim E. Richman, Esq. for Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. Service date 05/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2555811] [19-203] [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. Service date 02/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2491069] [19-203] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. Service date 02/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2491067] [19-203] [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY, Christina Yachiyo Taylor for Florida's Natural Growers, Inc. Citrus World, Inc, in case 19-203 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2483325] [19-203] [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Florida's Natural Growers, Inc. and Citrus World, Inc, FILED. Service date 01/28/2019 by CM/ECF. [2483292] [19-203] [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2483250] [19-203] [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Daniel H. Coultoff, Esq. for Appellee Florida's Natural Growers, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2479157] [19-203] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2479141] [19-203] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, district court receipt # ANYEDC-11116215, FILED.[2479137] [19-203] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2479120] [19-203] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alexandra Axon, FILED. [2479097] [19-203] [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.