This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/02/2020 at 06:05:52 (UTC).

Avertest, LLC v. Livingston County, MI

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Avertest, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Livingston County, MI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1858

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

AVERTEST, LLC, dba Averhealth

Defendant / Appellee

LIVINGSTON COUNTY, MI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kelly J. Shefferty

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Patrick C. Lannen

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Kelly J. Shefferly

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Sarah K. Osburn

Attorney at Cohl, Stoker & Toskey

601 N. Capitol Avenue

Lansing, MI 48933

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/09/2020; appellee brief due 12/09/2020; (KSF) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:48 PM]

#11

(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Kelly J. Shefferly for Appellant Avertest, LLC.. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2020. [20-1858] (KJS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:22 PM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Kelly J. Shefferly for Appellant Avertest, LLC Certificate of Service: 09/30/2020. [20-1858] (KJS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:21 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Avertest, LLC by Kelly J. Shefferly. Certificate of Service: 09/29/2020. [20-1858] (KJS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 05:30 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Sarah K. Osburn for Appellee Livingston County, MI Certificate of Service: 09/15/2020. [20-1858] (SKO) [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:06 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Livingston County, MI by Sarah K. Osburn. Certificate of Service: 09/15/2020. [20-1858] (SKO) [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:02 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:17 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Avertest, LLC by Patrick C. Lannen. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2020. [20-1858] (PCL) [Entered: 09/03/2020 04:13 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Avertest, LLC. Transcript needed: n. (KSF) [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:46 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/09/2020; appellee brief due 12/09/2020; (KSF) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Kelly J. Shefferly for Appellant Avertest, LLC.. Certificate of Service: 09/30/2020. [20-1858] (KJS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Kelly J. Shefferly for Appellant Avertest, LLC Certificate of Service: 09/30/2020. [20-1858] (KJS) [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Avertest, LLC by Kelly J. Shefferly. Certificate of Service: 09/29/2020. [20-1858] (KJS) [Entered: 09/29/2020 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#8) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Sarah K. Osburn for Appellee Livingston County, MI Certificate of Service: 09/15/2020. [20-1858] (SKO) [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Livingston County, MI by Sarah K. Osburn. Certificate of Service: 09/15/2020. [20-1858] (SKO) [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Avertest, LLC by Patrick C. Lannen. Certificate of Service: 09/03/2020. [20-1858] (PCL) [Entered: 09/03/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Avertest, LLC. Transcript needed: n. (KSF) [Entered: 09/03/2020 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Livingston County is a litigant

Latest cases where Avertest, LLC is a litigant