This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/13/2021 at 05:41:31 (UTC).

Avalos v. US

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Avalos filed an Other lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-119

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Respondents

THOMAS RHINEHART, JR.

JASON DIGNAN

JOSEPH AUGUSTA

JACQUIE DEMARCE

MATTHEW CRUMRINE

MARK MILLER

JAMES DAVIS

GEORGE DEMARCE

CHARLES PINNIZZOTTO

CARL WARNER

QUENTIN BACA

JESSE CARTER

KIMBERLY BUSH

MICHAEL CRUZ

ADAM SMITH

WILLIAM DENELL

JASON KARLHEIM

ALIEU JALLOW

MARK MUNOZ

DAVID JONES, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Theodore Reid Coploff

Attorney at McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP

1101 Vermont Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jack K. Whitehead Jr.

Attorney at Whitehead Law Firm

11909 Bricksome Avenue

Baton Rouge, LA 70816

Marshall Ray Esq.

Attorney at Law Offices of Marshall J. Ray, LLC

201 Twelfth Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Molly A. Elkin

Attorney at McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP

1101 Vermont Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Julie M. Wilson

Attorney at National Treasury Employees Union

800 K Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

Gregory O'Duden I

Attorney at National Treasury Employees Union

800 K Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

Allison Giles

Attorney at National Treasury Employees Union

800 K Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20001

Leon Dayan

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser, PLLC

805 15Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Jacob Y. Statman Esq.

Attorney at Snider & Associates, LLC

600 Reisterstown Road

Baltimore, MD 21208

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm, Pllc

Kirkpatrick Plaza, 10800 Financial Centre Parkway, Suite 510

Little Rock, AR 72211

Other Attorneys

William Clifton Alexander

Attorney at Anderson 2x, PLLC

819 N Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Sean Janda

Attorney at DOJ-Civ

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Mark B. Stern

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Heidi R. Burakiewicz

Attorney at Kalijarvi, Chuzi & Newman, PC

818 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

Michael Shih

Attorney at Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#4

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corrected Entry of appearance for Gregory O'Duden; Julie M. Wilson; Allison C. Giles; Leon Dayan as counsel for Respondents Eleazar Avalos and James Davis. Service: 03/12/2021 by email. [761927] [21-119] [Gregory O'Duden] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Respondents Eleazar Avalos and James Davis, Entry of Appearance [ # 7 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 03/17/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [761445] [MMA] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#9) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-119 (Lead) with 21-122, -123, -124, -125, -126, -127, -128, -129 (Member Cases). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [761433] [21-119, 21-122, 21-123, 21-124, 21-125, 21-126, 21-127, 21-128, 21-129] [MMA] [Entered: 03/10/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER consolidating appeals; The above-captioned petitions for interlocutory appeal are consolidated, and one set of briefing should be filed. The revised official caption is reflected above. Respondents are directed to respond to the petitions [ # 2 ] [ # 761052-2 ] [ # 761124-2 ] [ # 761147-2 ] [ # 761136-2 ] [ # 761145-2 ] [ # 761156-2 ] [ # 761168-2 ] [ # 761264-2 ] no later than 7 days from the date of filing of this order, including Respondents to Appeal No. 2021-119. Any reply in support of the petitions is due no later than 3 days thereafter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [761270] [21-119, 21-122, 21-123, 21-124, 21-125, 21-126, 21-127, 21-128, 21-129] [LMS] [Entered: 03/09/2021 05:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Gregory O'Duden; Julie M. Wilson; Allison C. Giles; Leon Dayan as counsel for Respondents Eleazar Avalos and James Davis. Service: 03/09/2021 by email. [761140] [21-119] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 10 ] [Gregory O'Duden] [Entered: 03/09/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Respondents Eleazar Avalos and James Davis, Entry of appearance [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 03/16/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [760973] [LMN] [Entered: 03/09/2021 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Gregory O'Duden; Julie M. Wilson; Allison C. Giles; Leon Dayan as counsel for Respondents Eleazar Avalos and James Davis Respondent-Plaintiff Tony Brooks; Respondent-Plaintiff David Magaki. Service: 03/08/2021 by email. [760838] [21-119] [Gregory O'Duden] [Entered: 03/08/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Sean Janda; Mark B. Stern; Michael Shih as counsel for Petitioner US. Service: 03/05/2021 by email. [760503] [21-119] [Sean Janda] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing Respondents to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] no later than 7 days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition is due 3 days thereafter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [760444] [NL] [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner US for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b), Fed. R. App. P. 5. Service: 03/04/2021 by email. [760279] [LMN] [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received:. [760278] Entry of Appearance is due 03/19/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/19/2021. [LMN] [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Janda

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Shih

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Clifton Alexander

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark B. Stern