This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 06:08:25 (UTC).

Austin Lightfeather v. Beatrice St. Dev. Center, et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 Austin Lightfeather filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Beatrice St Dev Center. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2654

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Austin Edward Lightfeather

Lincoln, NE 68509-0000

Defendant / Appellees

Beatrice State Developmental Center

Crisis Director Jesse

Pam Poll, Social Worker

Lee Wiener, Supervisor

Patrick Merritt, Supervisor

Scott Green, Supervisor

Ashley Lefty, Supervisor

Justin Ballord, Psychologist

Administrator Dawn

Devin Choat, Lead Supervisor

Lead Social Worker Tammy

Crystal Brown, Facility Staff

Jeremy

Trevor Davis

Bethany

Tommy Bower

Jennifer

Timothy Parks

Matthew

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Austin Edward Lightfeather

Attorney at LINCOLN REGIONAL CENTER

P.O. Box 94949

Lincoln, NE 68509-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Petition for Rehearing

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE ORDER: Denying [ # 5066063-2 ] petition for rehearing by panel filed by Appellant Mr. Austin Edward Lightfeather. Adp July 2021 [5073228] [21-2654] (HAG) [Entered: 09/07/2021 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION for rehearing by panel filed by Appellant Mr. Austin Edward Lightfeather, w/service by USCA8 08/16/2021. [5066063] [21-2654] (HAG) [Entered: 08/16/2021 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [5061801] [21-2654] (HAG) [Entered: 08/03/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - The district court referred a motion in appeal as a notice of appeal from the district courts July 14, 2021, order staying his civil rights action pending completion of state court proceedings. This motion in appeal is returned to the district court for consideration as a new case or an amended complaint and the appeal in this court is terminated. Mandate shall issue forthwith. STEVEN M. COLLOTON, JANE KELLY and L. STEVEN GRASZ Adp July 2021 [5061791] [21-2654] (HAG) [Entered: 08/03/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCASE SUBMITTED Ad Panel Submission before Judges Steven M. Colloton, Jane Kelly, L. Steven Grasz in St. Louis [5061681] [21-2654] (HAG) [Entered: 08/03/2021 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum & order 7/14/21, memorandum & order 7/26/21. [5058904] [21-2654] (CAH) [Entered: 07/27/2021 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrisoner case docketed. [5058895] [21-2654] (CAH) [Entered: 07/27/2021 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JEREMY, is a litigant

Latest cases where JENNIFER ANN HEATH AKA JENNIFER A CARE AKA JENNIFER CARE AKA JENIFFER CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where Matthews is a litigant