This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/28/2019 at 06:06:57 (UTC).

Aubrey v. Koppes, et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Aubrey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Koppes,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1153

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

WELD COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

CARLY KOPPES, as Weld County Clerk and Recorder

Plaintiff / Appellant

KIMBERLY AUBREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark Ratner

Attorney at Hall & Evans

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Kendra Kutko Smith

Attorney at Hall & Evans

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Alan Epstein

Attorney at Hall & Evans

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jennifer Robinson

Attorney at Robinson & Associates Law Office, LLC

3300 South Parker Road, Suite 330

Aurora, CO 80014

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Opening Brief

Open Document #2

Attachment - Order Granting Summary Judgment

Open Document #1

Appendix - Volume 1 of 3

Open Document #2

Appendix - Volume 2 of 3

Open Document #3

Appendix - Volume 3 of 3

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Docket[10656866] Minute order filed by Clerk of the Court granting motion to extend time to file eres brief. Appellees' brief now due 08/09/2019 for Weld County Board of County Commissioners and Carly Koppes (29 day extension). Served on 06/19/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1153] [Entered: 06/19/2019 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10656850] Motion filed by Appellees Carly Koppes and Weld County Board of County Commissioners to extend time to file appellee/respondent's brief until 08/09/2019. Served on: 06/19/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1153] AE [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Docket[10655842] Minute order filed - Appellees' response brief due 07/11/2019 for Weld County Board of County Commissioners and Carly Koppes. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1153] [Entered: 06/14/2019 08:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655168] Appellant's appendix filed by Kimberly Aubrey. Total number of volumes filed: 3. Served on 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1153] JR [Entered: 06/11/2019 07:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655167] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Kimberly Aubrey. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 06/11/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1153] JR [Entered: 06/11/2019 06:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10646544] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Alan Epstein, Mark Ratner and Ms. Kendra K. Smith for Weld County Board of County Commissioners and Carly Koppes. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1153] [Entered: 05/06/2019 01:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docket[10646476] Entry of appearance submitted by Alan Epstein, Mark S. Ratner, Kendra K. Smith for Appellees Carly Koppes and Weld County Board of County Commissioners for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/06/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1153] AE [Entered: 05/06/2019 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docket[10645978] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/03/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 06/12/2019 for Kimberly Aubrey. [19-1153] [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docket[10645936] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/10/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1153] [Entered: 05/03/2019 07:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10645930] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Jennifer Robinson for Kimberly Aubrey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1153] [Entered: 05/03/2019 07:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10645915] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Kimberly Aubrey. Served on: 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/03/2019 by SDS to correct event and modify docket text] [19-1153] JR [Entered: 05/02/2019 07:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10645914] Docketing statement filed by Kimberly Aubrey. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1153] JR [Entered: 05/02/2019 07:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docket[10645913] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer Robinson for Appellant Kimberly Aubrey for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/02/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1153] --[Edited 05/03/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 5/3/2019.] JR [Entered: 05/02/2019 07:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10644615] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/29/2019. Docketing statement due 05/13/2019 for Kimberly Aubrey. Transcript order form due 05/13/2019 for Kimberly Aubrey. Notice of appearance due on 05/13/2019 for Kimberly Aubrey, Carly Koppes and Weld County Board of County Commissioners [19-1153] [Entered: 04/29/2019 09:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less