This case was last updated from PACER on 04/22/2019 at 06:04:38 (UTC).

Atiya Wahab v. New Jersey Department of Envir, et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Atiya Wahab filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against New Jersey Department of Envir. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1396

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GWEN ZERVAS

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

DEBORAH FIGUEROA

STEVEN MAYBURY

PAM LYONS

Plaintiff / Appellant

ATIYA WAHAB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Deborah A. Hay Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625

Nicole E. Adams Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

Division Of Law, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex, 25 Market Street, P.O. Box 112

Trenton, NJ 08625

William P. Flahive Esq.

24 Arnett Avenue

Lambertville, NJ 08530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Donald F. Burke Esq.

45 Gale Road

Brick, NJ 08723

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER, Appeal Nos 18-3526 & 19-1396s have been consolidated for purposes of scheduling and disposition. It is noted that Appellee's brief in No. 18-3526 is due to be filed on or before March 6, 2019. The case opening forms for No. 19-1396 must be filed within 7 days of the date of this order. A briefing schedule for No. 19-1396 will be issued as soon as possible after case opening forms have been filed, filed. [18-3526, 19-1396] (JK) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:31 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Donald F. Burke, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Atiya Wahab. [19-1396] (DFB) [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:52 PM]

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Atiya Wahab advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1396]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by JK] (DFB) [Entered: 03/15/2019 05:13 PM]

Open Document #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Donald F. Burke, Esq. for Atiya Wahab requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 03/15/2019. (JK) [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:22 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William P. Flahive on behalf of Respondent(s) Deborah Figueroa. [19-1396]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by JK] (WPF) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:14 PM]

Open Document #2

District Court Opinion

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Atiya Wahab, filed. [19-1396] (DFB) [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:56 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to William P. Flahive, Esq. for Deborah Figueroa and Deborah A. Hay, Esq. for New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, State of New Jersey, Steven Maybury, Gwen Zervas and Pam Lyons requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/15/2019. (JK) [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:38 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nicole E. Adams on behalf of Appellee(s) State of New Jersey, DEP, Pam Lyons, Gwen Zervas and Steven Maybury. [19-1396] (NEA) [Entered: 03/14/2019 06:06 PM]

Open Document #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #2

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #3

District Court Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Atiya Wahab due on or before 04/29/2019. Appendix due on or before 04/29/2019. (JK) [Entered: 03/18/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Atiya Wahab advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1396]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by JK] (DFB) [Entered: 03/15/2019 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William P. Flahive on behalf of Respondent(s) Deborah Figueroa. [19-1396]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by JK] (WPF) [Entered: 03/15/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nicole E. Adams on behalf of Appellee(s) State of New Jersey, DEP, Pam Lyons, Gwen Zervas and Steven Maybury. [19-1396] (NEA) [Entered: 03/14/2019 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to William P. Flahive, Esq. for Deborah Figueroa and Deborah A. Hay, Esq. for New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection, State of New Jersey, Steven Maybury, Gwen Zervas and Pam Lyons requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/15/2019. (JK) [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Donald F. Burke, Esq. for Atiya Wahab requesting the following document(s): Transcript Purchase Order on or before 03/15/2019. (JK) [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Atiya Wahab, filed. [19-1396] (DFB) [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Donald F. Burke, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Atiya Wahab. [19-1396] (DFB) [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER, Appeal Nos 18-3526 & 19-1396s have been consolidated for purposes of scheduling and disposition. It is noted that Appellee's brief in No. 18-3526 is due to be filed on or before March 6, 2019. The case opening forms for No. 19-1396 must be filed within 7 days of the date of this order. A briefing schedule for No. 19-1396 will be issued as soon as possible after case opening forms have been filed, filed. [18-3526, 19-1396] (JK) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Atiya Wahab in District Court No. 3-12-cv-06613. (JK) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.