This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2020 at 05:24:22 (UTC).

Atem v. Barr

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Atem filed an Other lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-9616

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ERIC T. ATEM

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nji Anyere

Attorney at Anyere Law Firm

6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 260

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Respondent Attorneys

Lansing W. Tyler

Attorney at DHS Immigration and Customs Enforcement

12445 East Caley Avenue, Jim Bailey Building

Centennial, CO 80111

DOH/EOIR/BIA

Attorney at Attn: Certification Unit

P.O. Box 8530

Falls Church, VA 22041

Oil Oil

Attorney at Department of Justice

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Corey Leigh Farrell

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

Petition for Review Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

PFR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10781519] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 11/27/2020 for Nji Anyere. [20-9616] [Entered: 10/27/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10781415] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Corey Leigh Farrell for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/26/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-9616] [Entered: 10/26/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket[10781411] Entry of appearance submitted by Corey L. Farrell for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 10/26/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9616]--[Edited 10/26/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 10/26/2020]-- CLF [Entered: 10/26/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10781273] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Nji Anyere for Eric T. Atem. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 10/26/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-9616] [Entered: 10/26/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10781271] Petition for review filed. Served on 10/26/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorneys for Respondent: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Oil, and Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 10/26/2020 letter. Docketing statement due 11/09/2020 for Eric T. Atem. Agency record due 12/07/2020 for William P. Barr. Fee is due by 11/09/2020 for Eric T. Atem. Notice of appearance due on 11/09/2020 for Eric T. Atem and William P. Barr. [20-9616] [Entered: 10/26/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less