This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/14/2022 at 06:03:23 (UTC).

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP v. Secretary United States Department of Health and H, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed an Other lawsuit against Secretary United States Department of Health and H. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1676

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

Defendant / Appellants

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

GENERAL COUNSEL UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH HUMAN SERVICES

ADMINISTRATOR HEALTH RESOUCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Handwerker Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Suite 1121

Washington, DC 20001

Alexandra M. Joyce Esq.

Attorney at McCarter & English

405 North King Street, Renaissance Centre, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Allon Kedem Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Suite 1121

Washington, DC 20001

Sally L. Pei Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Suite 1121

Washington, DC 20001

Daniel M. Silver Esq.

Attorney at McCarter & English

405 North King Street, Renaissance Centre, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Stephen K. Wirth Esq.

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Suite 1121

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel J. Aguilar Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Jody D. Lowenstein Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L Street, N.W., Poc Agostinho, Jean

Washington, DC 20530

Kate Talmor Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

1100 L Street, N.W., Poc Agostinho, Jean

Washington, DC 20530

Rachael L. Westmoreland Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Room 7130

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

14 #1

Standing Order

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey L. Handwerker on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (JLH) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:26 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen K. Wirth on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (SKW) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:18 AM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sally L. Pei on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (SLP) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:15 AM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (AK) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:13 AM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Allon Kedem on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (AK) [Entered: 05/09/2022 10:58 AM]

#8

(#8) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jeffrey L. Handwerker, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Alexandra M. Joyce, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Allon Kedem, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Sally L. Pei, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Daniel M. Silver, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Stephen K. Wirth, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/18/2022. Disclosure Statement on or before 05/18/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 05/04/2022 01:27 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER (Clerk) the new appeal case (No. 22-1676) is consolidated for disposition with the pending appeals and cross-appeals from the New Jersey cases (Nos. 21-3167, 21-3168, 21-3379, and 21-3380). The four New Jersey appeals remain further consolidated for the purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, solidated for the purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix,. [21-3167, 21-3168, 21-3380, 21-3379, 22-1676] (KR) [Entered: 04/28/2022 11:21 AM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Health Resources and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services and Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:09 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Health Resources and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services and Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:07 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Health Resources and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services and Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:06 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel Aguilar on behalf of Appellant(s) HHS, Secretary of HHS, General Counsel of HHS, HRSA, Administrator of HRSA. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/21/2022 03:36 PM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Case Caption

1 #4

District Court Memorandum Opinion 021622

1 #2

District Court Judgment 031122

#1

Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services, Health Resources and Services Administration, Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services and United States Department of Health and Human Services due on or before 06/21/2022. Appendix due on or before 06/21/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 05/09/2022 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey L. Handwerker on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (JLH) [Entered: 05/09/2022 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen K. Wirth on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (SKW) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sally L. Pei on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (SLP) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (AK) [Entered: 05/09/2022 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Allon Kedem on behalf of Appellee(s) AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. [22-1676] (AK) [Entered: 05/09/2022 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Jeffrey L. Handwerker, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Alexandra M. Joyce, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Allon Kedem, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Sally L. Pei, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Daniel M. Silver, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and Stephen K. Wirth, Esq. for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/18/2022. Disclosure Statement on or before 05/18/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 05/04/2022 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER (Clerk) the new appeal case (No. 22-1676) is consolidated for disposition with the pending appeals and cross-appeals from the New Jersey cases (Nos. 21-3167, 21-3168, 21-3379, and 21-3380). The four New Jersey appeals remain further consolidated for the purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix, solidated for the purposes of scheduling, the joint appendix,. [21-3167, 21-3168, 21-3380, 21-3379, 22-1676] (KR) [Entered: 04/28/2022 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Health Resources and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services and Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Health Resources and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services and Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services, HHS, Health Resources and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services and Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/27/2022 11:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel Aguilar on behalf of Appellant(s) HHS, Secretary of HHS, General Counsel of HHS, HRSA, Administrator of HRSA. [22-1676] (DJA) [Entered: 04/21/2022 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 04/15/2022 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Administrator Health Resouces and Services Administration, General Counsel United States Department of Health Human Services, Health Resources and Services Administration, Secretary United States Department of Health and Human Services and HHS in District Court No. 1-21-cv-00027. (KR) [Entered: 04/15/2022 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant