This case was last updated from PACER on 07/01/2019 at 06:07:58 (UTC).

ASI, Inc. v. Fingerhut Direct Marketing

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 ASI, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fingerhut Direct Marketing. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1834

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

MANLEY TOYS, LTD., a Hong Kong, China corporation, dba Manley Toys, dba ToyQuest

MENARD, INC., a Wisconsin corporation

FINGERHUT DIRECT MARKETING, INC., a Delaware corporation

KMART CORPORATION, a Michigan corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

ASI, INC., a Minnesota corporation, fka Aviva Sports, Inc.

Respondent / Appellees

AQUAWOOD LLC

BRIAN DUBINSKY

PARK LANE SOLUTIONS LTD.

LISA LIU

BANZAI INTERNATIONAL, LTD.

SAMSON CHAN

TOY QUEST LIMITED

ALAN CHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Richard A. Grossman

Attorney at Law Office Of Richard A. Grossman, Esq.

2657 Coral Gum Ln

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Keith M. Sorge

Attorney at Arthur, Chapman, Kettering, Smetak & Pikala, PA

81 South 9Th Street, Suite 500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Stephen Adam Weisbrod

Attorney at Weisbrod Matteis & Copley PLLC

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Shelli L. Calland

Attorney at Weisbrod Matteis & Copley PLLC

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey E. Grell

Attorney at Grell Feist PLC

825 Nicollet Mall, Suite 625

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Eric Liebeler

Attorney at Stinson LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

Russell M. Spence Jr.

Attorney at Parker Daniels Kibort

123 North Third Street

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Theodore J. Waldeck

Attorney at Waldeck Law Firm P.A.

121 S 8Th St, Ste 1400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David F. Crosby

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

22 #3

supporting document

22 #2

supporting document

22 #1

Motion

21 #2

Certificate of Service

21 #1

Entry of Appearance

20 #2

Certificate of Service

20 #1

Entry of Appearance

19 #2

Declaration

19 #1

Motion

#8

(#8) Entry of appearance for Eric C. Liebeler as principal counsel for Appellees Samson Chan, Alan Chan, Brian Dubinsky, Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Park Lane Solutions Ltd. and Toy Quest Limited. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [608014] [19-1834] [Eric Liebeler] [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:24 PM]

#7

(#7) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607999] [19-1834] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:35 PM]

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant ASI, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/23/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[607986] [JAL] [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:07 PM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607963] [19-1834] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:06 PM]

#4

(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant ASI, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/23/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[607986] [JAL] [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:07 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Shelli L. Calland as of counsel for Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607914] [19-1834] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:25 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Keith M. Sorge as principal counsel for Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607878] [19-1834] [Keith Sorge] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:40 AM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION of Appellees Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Alan Chan, Samson Chan, Brian Dubinsky, Lisa Liu, Park Lane Solutions Ltd. and Toy Quest Limited to extend the time to 10/11/2019 to file the Appellees' Response Brief., to set briefing schedule [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/26/2019 by email. [617181] [19-1834] [Eric Liebeler] [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Amended Entry of appearance for Keith M. Sorge as of counsel for Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 06/24/2019 by email. [616535] [19-1834] [Keith Sorge] [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Entry of appearance for Stephen A. Weisbrod as principal counsel for Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 06/20/2019 by email. [615862] [19-1834] [Stephen Weisbrod] [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION of Appellant ASI, Inc. to extend the time to 07/31/2019, to set briefing schedule [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/20/2019 by email. [615815] [19-1834] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#18) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [613345] [JAL] [Entered: 06/12/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • (#17) Official caption revised to reflect non-participation of Manley Toys, Ltd. The revised official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [613017] [JAL] [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Samson Chan, Alan Chan, Lisa Liu, Brian Dubinsky, Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Park Lane Solutions Ltd. and Toy Quest Limited. Service: 05/22/2019 by email. [608933] [19-1834] [Eric Liebeler] [Entered: 05/22/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Alan Chan, Samson Chan, Brian Dubinsky, Lisa Liu, Park Lane Solutions Ltd., and Toy Quest Limited, Corrected Certificate of Interest [ # 13 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/29/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[608827] [JAL] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#14) Notice to counsel for Appellee Manley Toys, Ltd.: The record of this case indicates that the Entry of Appearance, Certificate of Interest, and Docketing Statement have not been filed. Completed documents must be submitted by 05/28/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [608795] [JAL] [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Samson Chan, Alan Chan, Lisa Liu, Brian Dubinsky, Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Park Lane Solutions Ltd. and Toy Quest Limited. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. [608582] [19-1834] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 15 ] [Eric Liebeler] [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Samson Chan, Alan Chan, Lisa Liu, Brian Dubinsky, Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Park Lane Solutions Ltd. and Toy Quest Limited. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [608018] [19-1834] [Eric Liebeler] [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Samson Chan, Alan Chan, Lisa Liu, Brian Dubinsky, Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Park Lane Solutions Ltd. and Toy Quest Limited. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [608015] [19-1834] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Eric Liebeler] [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Eric C. Liebeler as principal counsel for Appellees Samson Chan, Alan Chan, Brian Dubinsky, Aquawood LLC, Banzai International, Ltd., Park Lane Solutions Ltd. and Toy Quest Limited. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [608014] [19-1834] [Eric Liebeler] [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607999] [19-1834] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant ASI, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 05/23/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[607986] [JAL] [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607963] [19-1834] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607958] [19-1834] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 6 ] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 05/16/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Shelli L. Calland as of counsel for Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607914] [19-1834] [Shelli Calland] [Entered: 05/16/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Keith M. Sorge as principal counsel for Appellant ASI, Inc.. Service: 05/16/2019 by email. [607878] [19-1834] [Keith Sorge] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/01/2019. [604631] Entry of Appearance is due 05/16/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/16/2019. Docketing Statement is due 05/16/2019. Appellant's brief is due 07/01/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 05/02/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Park Lane Solutions, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Toy Quest Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Manley Toys, Ltd. is a litigant