This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2019 at 06:00:53 (UTC).

Ashley Prior v. State of South Carolina

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 a Prisoner - Prison Condition case was filed by Ashley Prior against State of South Carolina in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7381

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN B. MCCREE

JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, SCDC Kirkland Staff

SHERIFF OF COLUMBIA

BRYAN P. STIRLING

JAMES & JOAN DOE 1-10, DHEC and SCDC Investigators of Health Services, etc

STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA

Plaintiff / Appellant

ASHLEY T. PRIOR

Columbia, SC 29210-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ashley T. Prior

Attorney at KIRKLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

4344 Broad River Road

Columbia, SC 29210-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01619-TMC. Case manager: KHancock. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:01 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Ashley Prior #290973. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Financial Section, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Post Office Box 21787, Columbia, SC 29221, Ashley Prior. [1000609788] [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:27 PM]

#4

(#4) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ashley T. Prior. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:21 PM]

#7

(#7) RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. 11/01/2019 [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:29 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ashley T. Prior KIRKLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ICS 163-BF2 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210-0000. Informal Opening Brief due 10/25/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:09 PM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Ashley T. Prior ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Ashley Prior. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:03 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • (#8) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01619-TMC. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. 11/01/2019 [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER filed granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Ashley Prior #290973. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Financial Section, South Carolina Department of Corrections, Post Office Box 21787, Columbia, SC 29221, Ashley Prior. [1000609788] [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#5) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Ashley T. Prior. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Ashley T. Prior. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ashley T. Prior KIRKLAND CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ICS 163-BF2 4344 Broad River Road Columbia, SC 29210-0000. Informal Opening Brief due 10/25/2019 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Ashley T. Prior ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Ashley Prior. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01619-TMC. Case manager: KHancock. [19-7381] KH [Entered: 10/01/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.