This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/03/2022 at 06:18:11 (UTC).

Ashley Popa v. Harriet Carter Gifts Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Ashley Popa filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Harriet Carter Gifts Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2203

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HARRIET CARTER GIFTS INC, a Pennsylvania corporation

NAVISTONE INC, a Delaware corporation

Plaintiff / Appellant

ASHLEY POPA, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah A. Ballard Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Carrie H. Dettmer Slye Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

312 Walnut Street, Suite 3200

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Paul G. Karlsgodt Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Emily B. Thomas Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1735 Market Street, Suite 3300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Eamonn Hart Esq.

184 Main Street, P.O. Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243

David W. Bertoni Esq.

184 Main Street, P.O. Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243

David W. Bertoni Esq. I

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main Street, 4Th Floor

Lewiston, ME 04240

Devin J. Chwastyk Esq.

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick

100 Pine Street, P.O. Box 1166

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Rachel R. Hadrick Esq.

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick

100 Pine Street, P.O. Box 1166

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Eamonn R.C. Hart Esq.

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main Street, 4Th Floor

Lewiston, ME 04240

David Swetnam-Burland Esq.

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main Street, 4Th Floor

Lewiston, ME 04240

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jamisen A. Etzel Esq.

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kelly K. Iverson Esq.

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Gary F. Lynch Esq.

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Elizabeth Pollock-Avery Esq.

Attorney at Lynch Carpenter

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

82 #11

Exhibit J

82 #10

Exhibit I

82 #7

Exhibit F

82 #6

Exhibit E

82 #5

Exhibit D

82 #4

Exhibit C

82 #3

Exhibit B

82 #2

Exhibit A

82 #1

Letter Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j)

#5

#4

#3

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order

1 #4

caption

1 #3

DC Order 6/17/21

1 #2

DC Opinion 6/17/21

#1

Civil Case Docketed

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) ECF FILER: Letter dated 09/23/2022 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellee Navistone Inc. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [21-2203] (DWB) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellee Navistone Inc for Rehearing before original panel and the court en banc. Certificate of Service dated 08/30/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-2203] (DJC) [Entered: 08/30/2022 06:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ORDER (CHAGARES, Chief Judge, AMBRO and FUENTES, Circuit Judges) The foregoing Motion by Appellant to File Documents under Seal (Appendix Vol. IV) and the Motion by Appellant to File Documents under Seal (Brief) are granted. Thomas L. Ambro, Authoring Judge. (MS) [Entered: 08/23/2022 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) JUDGMENT, Vacated and Remanded. (LMR) [Entered: 08/16/2022 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: CHAGARES, Chief Judge, AMBRO and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 21. Judge: AMBRO Authoring. (LMR) [Entered: 08/16/2022 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Navistone Inc to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 06/28/2022. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [21-2203] (DWB) [Entered: 06/28/2022 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ECF FILER: Letter dated 06/27/2022 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ashley Popa. Service made by ECF. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. [21-2203] (GFL) [Entered: 06/27/2022 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ECF FILER: Transcript of oral argument on 06/08/2022 prepared at the direction of the Court. [21-2203] (DJC) [Entered: 06/21/2022 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) CLERK'S LETTER to counsel written at the direction of the Court. At the direction of the court, counsel are hereby directed to file a transcript of oral argument by Wednesday, June 22, 2022. in the above entitled case. Liaison counsel should immediately advise the Clerk's Office of the Court Reporter or agency handling the Transcription of oral argument. The parties shall share the cost of the preparation of the transcript. (Please see letter attached for full text) (CMH) [Entered: 06/08/2022 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docket(#73) ARGUED on Wednesday, June 8, 2022. Panel: CHAGARES, Chief Judge, AMBRO and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. David W. Bertoni, I arguing for Appellee Navistone Inc; Paul G. Karlsgodt arguing for Appellee Harriet Carter Gifts Inc; Gary F. Lynch arguing for Appellant Ashley Popa. (CMH) [Entered: 06/08/2022 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kelly K. Iverson on behalf of Appellant(s) Ashley Popa. [21-2203] (KKI) [Entered: 07/07/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gary F. Lynch on behalf of Appellant(s) Ashley Popa. [21-2203] (GFL) [Entered: 07/07/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Harriet Carter Gifts Inc. [21-2203] (SAB) [Entered: 07/07/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Ballard on behalf of Appellee(s) Harriet Carter Gifts, Inc.. [21-2203] (SAB) [Entered: 07/07/2021 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Navistone Inc. [21-2203] (DWB) [Entered: 07/07/2021 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Rachel R. Hadrick on behalf of Appellee(s) NaviStone, Inc.. [21-2203] (RRH) [Entered: 07/01/2021 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Devin J. Chwastyk on behalf of Appellee(s) NaviStone, Inc.. [21-2203] (DJC) [Entered: 07/01/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David Waller Bertoni on behalf of Appellee(s) NaviStone, Inc.. [21-2203] (DWB) [Entered: 06/30/2021 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ashley Popa in District Court No. 2-19-cv-00450. (TMM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVISTONE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Pollock-Avery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamisen A. Etzel