This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/09/2021 at 22:16:13 (UTC).

Asante, et al v. California Department of Healt, et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 Asante filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against California Department of Healt. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-17080

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEMS, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company registered in Nevada

ASANTE, an Oregon nonprofit corporation

RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER, Nevada Non Profit Corporation

SOUTHERN HILLS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, A Nevada Limited Liability Company

SPARKS FAMILY HOSPITAL, INC., A Nevada Corporation

HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company registered in Arizona, on behalf of HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER in Lake Havasu City, Arizona

YUMA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, An Arizona non Profit Corporation

HAVASU REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, A Delaware Lilmited Liability Company registered in Arizona

CLARK COUNTY

SKY LAKES MEDICAL CENTER, INC., An Oregon Non Profit Corporation

PHC-FORT MOHAVE, INC., An Arizona Corporation

SUNRISE HOSPIAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, A Delaware Limited Liability Company registered in Nevada

SUMMERLIN HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC

SUNRISE MOUNTAINVIEW HOSPITAL, INC., A Nevada Corporation

RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, Nevada non profit corporation

Defendant / Appellants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

JENNIFER KENT, Director of the California Department of Healthcare Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Sorgen

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL S. SORGEN

240 Stockton Street

San Francisco, CA 94108

Dean L. Johnson

Attorney at Dean L. Johnson, Inc.

6863 Tanzanite Drive

Carlsbad, CA 92009

Thomas J. Weiss

Attorney at Weiss & Zaman

16633 Ventura Blvd., Suite 510

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer Celeste Addams

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Joshua Sondheimer

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Susan Marie Carson

Attorney at AGCA - Office of the California Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Docketing Letter

1 #4

Cross Appeal Chart

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Questionnaire

#1

Mediation Letter

#42

#41

40 #2

Certificate of Service

40 #1

Bill of Costs (17-15550)

39 #2

Certificate of Service

39 #1

Bill of Costs (16-16866, 16-17080)

#38

37 #2

Post Judgment Form

37 #1

Opinion

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MANDATE ISSUED.(FFF, MMM and JMF) Costs taxed against Asante, et al in the amount of $555.80. [10881120] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (JFF) [Entered: 05/22/2018 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Filed order (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and JULIO M. FUENTES) The panel has unanimously voted to deny Appellants petition for rehearing. The petition for rehearing en banc was circulated to the judges of the court, and no judge requested a vote for en banc consideration. The petition for rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc are DENIED. [10870648] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (WL) [Entered: 05/14/2018 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Filed (ECF) Appellants California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent in 17-15550, Appellees California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent in 16-16866, 16-17080 bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 289.8 USD. Date of service: 04/16/2018 [10838671] [17-15550, 16-16866, 16-17080] (Sondheimer, Joshua) [Entered: 04/16/2018 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Filed (ECF) Appellees California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent in 16-16866, Appellants California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent in 16-17080, 17-15550 bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 266 USD. Date of service: 04/16/2018 [10838655] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (Sondheimer, Joshua) [Entered: 04/16/2018 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Filed (ECF) Appellants Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center in 16-16866, Appellees Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center in 16-17080, 17-15550 petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 04/02/2018 opinion). Date of service: 04/13/2018. [10836488] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (Johnson, Dean) [Entered: 04/13/2018 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) FILED OPINION (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and JULIO M. FUENTES) REVERSED. Judge: FFF Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10820278] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] --[Edited: Summary corrected. 04/02/2018 by TYL] (RMM) [Entered: 04/02/2018 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Filed order (FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and JULIO M. FUENTES) The Department of Health Care Services request for judicial notice dated September 28, 2017, is DENIED. [10799882] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (OC) [Entered: 03/15/2018 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [10799821] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (BJK) [Entered: 03/15/2018 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Docket(#54) ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO FERDINAND F. FERNANDEZ, M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and JULIO M. FUENTES. [10797953] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (BJK) [Entered: 03/14/2018 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Oral argument, scheduled for March 14, 2018, at San Francisco, California, shall be limited to fifteen minutes per side. [10784115] [16-16866, 16-17080, 17-15550] (OC) [Entered: 03/02/2018 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2017
  • Docket(#10) Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 7 ] in 2 volume(s) filed by Appellants/Cross-Appellees. [10353758] [16-16866, 16-17080] (SML) [Entered: 03/13/2017 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Docket(#9) Received 7 paper copies of First Brief on Cross-Appeal [ # 6 ] filed by appellants/cross-appellees. [10351017] [16-16866, 16-17080] (SD) [Entered: 03/09/2017 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed clerk order: The first brief on cross-appeal [ # 6 ] submitted by appellants/cross-appellees is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 7 ] submitted by appellants/cross-appellees. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10345206] [16-16866, 16-17080] (SML) [Entered: 03/06/2017 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center in 16-16866, Appellees Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center in 16-17080. Date of service: 03/03/2017. [10343265] [16-16866, 16-17080]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected excerpts of record. 03/06/2017 by SLM] (Johnson, Dean) [Entered: 03/03/2017 07:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) First Brief on Cross-Appeal for review. Submitted by Appellants Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center in 16-16866, Appellees Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center in 16-17080. Date of service: 03/03/2017. [10343264] [16-16866, 16-17080]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief and updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 03/06/2017 by SLM] (Johnson, Dean) [Entered: 03/03/2017 07:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Mediation order: These cases are not selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [10254858] [16-16866, 16-17080] (VS) [Entered: 01/04/2017 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order MEDIATION (SL): The conference originally scheduled for December 16, 2016, is rescheduled to January 4, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The cross-appeal briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: plaintiffs shall file the first cross appeal brief on or before March 9, 2017; defendants shall file the second cross appeal brief on or before April 10, 2017; plaintiffs shall file the third cross appeal brief on or before May 10, 2017; defendants may file an optional cross appeal reply brief within 14 days of service of third brief on cross appeal. [10216370] [16-16866, 16-17080] (Trierweiler, Nicole) [Entered: 11/30/2016 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 12/16/2016, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10207553] [16-16866, 16-17080] (VS) [Entered: 11/22/2016 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellees California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent in 16-16866, Appellants California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent in 16-17080 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/21/2016. [10205553] [16-16866, 16-17080] (Sondheimer, Joshua) [Entered: 11/21/2016 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/21/2016. First cross appeal brief due 01/23/2017 for Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center. Second brief on cross appeal due 02/23/2017 for California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent. Third brief on cross appeal due 03/23/2017 for Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC and Yuma Regional Medical Center. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent is due within 14 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [10195227] [16-17080, 16-16866] (RT) [Entered: 11/14/2016 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHC-Fort Mohave Incorporated is a litigant