This case was last updated from PACER on 03/25/2019 at 06:08:13 (UTC).

Arthur Henderson v. Superintendent Fayette SCI, et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Arthur Henderson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Superintendent Fayette SCI. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1176

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SUPERINTENDENT FAYETTE SCI

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

Plaintiff / Appellant

ARTHUR LAMONT HENDERSON

Labelle, PA 15450

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Daniel A. Vernacchio Esq.

Attorney at Allegheny County Office of District Attorney

436 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Arthur Lamont Henderson

Attorney at Fayette SCI

48 Overlook Drive

Labelle, PA 15450

 

Court Documents

Open Document

STATE COURT RECORD returned. 1 Box. (AR) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:36 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

State Court Record

Open Restricted Document #3

State Court record

Open Restricted Document #1

State Court Record

Open Restricted Document #5

State Court Record

Open Restricted Document #4

State Court Record

Open Restricted Document #6

State Court Record

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Arthur Lamont Henderson, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 03/01/2019 09:55 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel A. Vernacchio on behalf of Appellee(s) Superintendent SCI Fayette, Attorney General of Pennsylvania. [19-1176] (DAV) [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:14 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Daniel A. Vernacchio, Esq. for Attorney General Pennsylvania and Superintendent Fayette SCI requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/22/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:54 PM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) Action on the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is deferred. Appellant must submit a 6 month prison account statement within 14 days of the date of this order, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:31 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Arthur Lamont Henderson for Certificate of Appealability. Response, if any, due on 02/15/2019. Certificate of Service dated 01/29/2019. Service made by US mail. (CJG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:59 AM]

Open Document #3

Judgment

Open Document #4

Caption

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATE COURT RECORD returned. 1 Box. (AR) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATE COURT RECORD received. 1 Box. (AR) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Arthur Lamont Henderson, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 03/01/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Arthur Lamont Henderson, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel A. Vernacchio on behalf of Appellee(s) Superintendent SCI Fayette, Attorney General of Pennsylvania. [19-1176] (DAV) [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Daniel A. Vernacchio, Esq. for Attorney General Pennsylvania and Superintendent Fayette SCI requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/22/2019. (CJG) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) Action on the motion to proceed in forma pauperis is deferred. Appellant must submit a 6 month prison account statement within 14 days of the date of this order, filed. (CJG) [Entered: 02/07/2019 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Arthur Lamont Henderson for Certificate of Appealability. Response, if any, due on 02/15/2019. Certificate of Service dated 01/29/2019. Service made by US mail. (CJG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Arthur Lamont Henderson to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (CJG) [Entered: 02/04/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Arthur Lamont Henderson in District Court No. 2-18-cv-00666. (SLC) [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.