This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2019 at 06:09:52 (UTC).

Arthur Clark v. Lynn Sheffield, et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Arthur Clark filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lynn Sheffield. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11230

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

LYNN SHEFFIELD, Sheriff

PETER WROBEL

TOMMY BARRENTINE

Plaintiff / Appellant

ARTHUR LAWTON CLARK

Pelham, GA 31779-0648

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jason C. Waymire

Attorney at Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC

4330 S Lee St Ne Bldg 400 Ste A

Buford, GA 30518

Samuel Emerson Britt III

Attorney at Brennan Wasden & Painter, LLC

411 E Liberty St

Savannah, GA 31401

Spencer Armpstead Bomar

Attorney at Weathington McGrew, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 3900

Atlanta, GA 30303

James Gabriel Banks

Attorney at Weathington McGrew, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 3900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Autry SP Warden

Attorney at Autry SP - Inmate Trust Fund

Po Box 648

Pelham, GA 31779-0648

Arthur Lawton Clark

Attorney at Autry SP - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 648

Pelham, GA 31779-0648

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Waymire for Appellees Tommy Barrentine and Lynn Sheffield. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11230] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:45 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark. [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:49 PM]

Open Document #3

Clerk's Judgment doc#79

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Arthur Lawton Clark. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:47 PM]

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document

MOTION for 14 day extension of time to file appellant's brief to 05/28/2019 filed by Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8768527-1] [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:58 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Gabriel Banks for Peter Wrobel, MD [19-11230] (ECF: James Banks) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:32 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason C. Waymire for Tommy Barrentine and Lynn Sheffield. [19-11230] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:42 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Arthur Lawton Clark. No hearings. [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:31 AM]

Open Document #4

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11230] (ECF: James Banks) [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:36 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/13/2019. [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:34 PM]

Open Document #1

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

DC Order Adopting Report and Recommendations doc#78

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including May 28, 2019 in which to file Appellants brief is GRANTED. [ # 8768527-2 ] SM [Entered: 05/16/2019 07:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Arthur Lawton Clark. No hearings. [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Waymire for Appellees Tommy Barrentine and Lynn Sheffield. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11230] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jason C. Waymire for Tommy Barrentine and Lynn Sheffield. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/01/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for 14 day extension of time to file appellant's brief to 05/28/2019 filed by Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8768527-1] [Entered: 05/09/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11230] (ECF: James Banks) [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark. [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Arthur Lawton Clark. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/13/2019. [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Appellate fee was paid on 04/16/2019 as to Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark. [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Gabriel Banks for Peter Wrobel, MD [19-11230] (ECF: James Banks) [Entered: 04/15/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason C. Waymire for Tommy Barrentine and Lynn Sheffield. [19-11230] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 04/04/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Arthur Lawton Clark on 04/02/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/04/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.