This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2021 at 06:18:40 (UTC).

Arthur Cartee v. Boehringer Ingelheim, et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Arthur Cartee filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10305

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PFIZER, INC.

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

ARTHUR CARTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Julia Zousmer

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

110 N Wacker Dr Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60606

Mark S. Cheffo

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Ave Fl 22

New York, NY 10010

Eric Francis Gladbach

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Justin D. Rodriguez

Attorney at Atkinson Baker & Rodriguez, PC

201 3Rd St Nw Ste 1850

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Richard J. Sapp

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode, PC

700 Walnut St Ste 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309-3899

Douglas A. Baker

Attorney at Atkinson Baker & Rodriguez, PC

201 3Rd St Nw Ste 1850

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Madison Kitchens

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Cheryl A. Sabnis

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

101 2Nd St Ste 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Frances M. Haas

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode PC

One Greatamerica Plaza, 625 1St St Se Ste 400

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Jessica Perry Corley

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gregory A. Ruehlmann

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Elizabeth Francesca Lindquist

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1515 Wynkoop St Ste 800

Denver, CO 80202

James G. Powers

Attorney at McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC

1601 Dodge St Ste 3700

Omaha, NE 68102

Mark Alan Sentenac

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Patrick M. Fahey

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin, LLP

1 Constitution Plz Fl 19

Hartford, CT 06103

Garth Yearick

Attorney at Carlton Fields, PA

525 Okeechobee Blvd Ste 1200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Joseph G. Petrosinelli

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw Ste 1038

Washington, DC 20005

Stephen B. Devereaux

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Amy L. O'Neill

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

621 Capitol Mall Ste 1500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Edward A. Wallace

Attorney at Wexler Wallace, LLP

55 W Monroe Ste 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Order on Motion to Dismiss doc#2516

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noah Heinz for Plaintiff-Appellant Arthur Cartee [21-10305] (ECF: Noah Heinz) [Entered: 03/25/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket17-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Arthur Cartee. Updated Awaiting Response to Motion. Due on 03/29/2021 as to Appellant Arthur Cartee. [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket20-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Arthur Cartee. Appellants brief due on 03/29/2021 as to Appellant Arthur Cartee. Appendix due on 04/05/2021 as to Appellant Arthur Cartee. [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9322750-1] [21-10305] (ECF: Paul Mezzina) [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Paul Mezzina for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10305] (ECF: Paul Mezzina) [Entered: 02/25/2021 08:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jay P. Lefkowitz for Appellee GlaxoSmithKline LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10305] (ECF: Jay Lefkowitz) [Entered: 02/25/2021 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Charles McCloud for Appellee PFE. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10305] (ECF: Charles McCloud) [Entered: 02/25/2021 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jay P. Lefkowitz for Appellee GlaxoSmithKline LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10305] (ECF: Jay Lefkowitz) [Entered: 02/25/2021 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Madison H. Kitchens for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Madison Kitchens for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC and PFE. [21-10305] (ECF: Madison Kitchens) [Entered: 02/19/2021 10:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul Alessio Mezzina for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [21-10305] (ECF: Paul Mezzina) [Entered: 02/19/2021 10:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jay P. Lefkowitz for GlaxoSmithKline LLC [21-10305] (ECF: Jay Lefkowitz) [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edward A. Wallace for Arthur Cartee. [21-10305] (ECF: Edward Wallace) [Entered: 02/15/2021 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Arthur Cartee. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/09/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Arthur Cartee. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 02/12/2021 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Arthur Cartee. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10305] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Arthur Cartee. [21-10305] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/11/2021 07:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Appellant Arthur Cartee. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [21-10305] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ashley Keller for Arthur Cartee Mr. Ashley Conrad Keller for Arthur Cartee. [21-10305] (ECF: Ashley Keller) [Entered: 02/10/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 01/27/2021 as to Appellant Arthur Cartee. [Entered: 02/01/2021 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Arthur Cartee on 01/27/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/11/2021 as to Appellant Arthur Cartee. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/25/2021 as to Appellee Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [Entered: 02/01/2021 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GlaxoSmithKline LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward A. Wallace