This case was last updated from PACER on 05/07/2019 at 06:04:01 (UTC).

Arizona Family Health Partner, et al v. HHS

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 Arizona Family Health Partner filed an Other lawsuit against HHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5054

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Arizona Family Health Partnership

Family Planning Council of Iowa 108

Defendant / Appellant

United States Department of Health and Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Creighton Magid Esquire

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

1401 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [19-5001, 19-5054] [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:26 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1779197] filed granting motion to dismiss cases voluntarily [ # 1777546-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [19-5001, 19-5054] [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:22 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION [1777546] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by Arizona Family Health Partnership, Family Planning Council of Iowa 108 and HHS in 19-5001, 19-5054 [Service Date: 03/14/2019 ] Length Certification: 29 words. [19-5001, 19-5054] (Lilley, Jaynie) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:06 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1776904] filed consolidating cases 19-5054 (Cross-appeal started 03/11/2019) with 19-5001; directing party to file in 19-5054 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/25/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/25/2019. [19-5001, 19-5054] [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:07 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1776713] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02581-TNM filed by HHS. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5054. [19-5054] [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:33 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [19-5001, 19-5054] [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1779197] filed granting motion to dismiss cases voluntarily [ # 1777546-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [19-5001, 19-5054] [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION [1777546] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by Arizona Family Health Partnership, Family Planning Council of Iowa 108 and HHS in 19-5001, 19-5054 [Service Date: 03/14/2019 ] Length Certification: 29 words. [19-5001, 19-5054] (Lilley, Jaynie) [Entered: 03/14/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1776904] filed consolidating cases 19-5054 (Cross-appeal started 03/11/2019) with 19-5001; directing party to file in 19-5054 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/25/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/25/2019. [19-5001, 19-5054] [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • NOTICE [1776901] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record: sealed supplement to the notice of appeal. [19-5054] [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1776713] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02581-TNM filed by HHS. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5054. [19-5054] [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5054] [Entered: 03/08/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less