This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2021 at 18:53:18 (UTC).

Arizona Attorneys for C.J., et al v. Mark Brnovich, et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Arizona Attorneys for C J filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Mark Brnovich. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16293

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FRANK MILSTEAD, Colonel, in his official capacity as Director of the Arizona Department of Public Safety.

MARET VESSELLA, Chief Bar Counsel of the State Bar of Arizona;

MARK BRNOVICH, Attorney General, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Arizona;

COLONEL HESTON SILBERT, Colonel, in his official capacity as Director of the Arizona Department of Public Safety.

Plaintiff / Appellants

JOHN CANBY

RICH ROBERTSON

CHRISTOPHER BAIRD DUPONT

ARIZONA ATTORNEYS FOR CRIMINAL JUSTICE;

RICHARD L. LOUGEE

RICHARD D. RANDALL

JEFFREY A. KIRCHLER

ARIZONA ATTORNEYS FOR CRIMINAL JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eryn Marie McCarthy

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Nancy Bonnell

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Lisa T. Hauser

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC

2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Carrie Ann Laliberte

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint, PC

2325 E. Camelback Road, Suite 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Brunn W. Roysden III

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Oramel H. Skinner Esquire III

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Kate B. Sawyer

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Michael S. Catlett

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kathleen Erin Brody

Attorney at Mitchell Stein Carey Chapman, PC

One Renaissance Square, 2 North Central Avenue, Suite 1450

Phoenix, AZ 85004

David Arthur Lane

Attorney at Killmer, Lane & Newman, LLP

1543 Champa Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

Andrew McNulty

Attorney at Killmer, Lane & Newman, LLP

1543 Champa Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

Jared G. Keenan

Attorney at ACLU of Arizona

3707 N. 7Th Street

Phoenix, AZ 85014

 

Court Documents

#63

(#63) Filed (ECF) Attorney Lisa T. Hauser for Appellee Maret Vessella response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12048659] [20-16293] (Hauser, Lisa) [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:52 AM]

#61

(#61) Filed (ECF) Attorney Nancy Bonnell for Appellee Colonel Heston Silbert response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 03/17/2021. [12045253] [20-16293] (Bonnell, Nancy) [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:41 PM]

#56

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

19 #8

ER Vol 8

19 #7

ER Vol 7

19 #5

ER Vol 5

19 #3

ER Vol 3

19 #2

ER Vol 2

#18

No Description Available

#3

(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/23/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11747204] (VS) [Entered: 07/09/2020 11:02 AM]

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Filed (ECF) Appellee Maret Vessella citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/30/2021. [12159765] [20-16293] (Hauser, Lisa) [Entered: 06/30/2021 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Filed (ECF) Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, John Canby, Christopher Baird Dupont, Jeffrey A. Kirchler, Richard L. Lougee, Richard D. Randall and Rich Robertson citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/30/2021. [12158951] [20-16293] (Brody, Kathleen) [Entered: 06/30/2021 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#68) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Mr. Michael S. Catlett for Appellees Mr. Mark Brnovich and Colonel Heston Silbert. Hearing in Portland on 07/06/2021 at 12:00 P.M. (Courtroom: 2nd Floor Courtroom). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 10.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 05/27/2021. [12126746] [20-16293] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 5/28/2021 by TYL] (Catlett, Michael) [Entered: 05/27/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#67) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Lisa T. Hauser for Appellee Maret Vessella. Hearing in Portland on 07/06/2021 at 12:00 P.M. (Courtroom: 2nd Floor Courtroom). Filer sharing argument time: Yes. (Argument minutes: 5.) Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 05/27/2021. [12126604] [20-16293] (Hauser, Lisa) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#66) Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice by Attorney Kathleen Erin Brody for Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, John Canby, Christopher Baird Dupont, Jeffrey A. Kirchler, Richard L. Lougee, Richard D. Randall and Rich Robertson. Hearing in Portland on 07/06/2021 at 12:00 P.M. (Courtroom: PO 2nd Floor Ctrm). Filer sharing argument time: No. Special accommodations: NO. Filer admission status: I certify that I am admitted to practice before this Court. Date of service: 04/26/2021. [12086846] [20-16293] (Brody, Kathleen) [Entered: 04/26/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2021
  • Docket(#65) Notice of Oral Argument on Tuesday, July 6, 2021 - 12:00 P.M. - PO 2nd Floor Ctrm - Scheduled Location: Portland OR. The hearing time is the local time zone at the scheduled hearing location. View the Oral Argument Calendar for your case # here . NOTE: Although your case is currently scheduled for oral argument, the panel may decide to submit the case on the briefs instead. See Fed. R. App. P. 34. Absent further order of the court, if the court does determine that oral argument is required in this case, any argument will be held with all attorneys appearing remotely by video or telephone. The court strongly prefers video arguments whenever possible. Travel to a courthouse will not be required. If the panel determines that it will hold oral argument, the Clerk's Office will be in contact with you directly at least two weeks before the set argument date to make any necessary arrangements for remote appearance. Be sure to review the # GUIDELINES for important information about your hearing, including when to be available (30 minutes before the hearing time) and when and how to submit additional citations (filing electronically as far in advance of the hearing as possible). If you are the specific attorney or self-represented party who will be arguing, use the # ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE filing type in CM/ECF no later than 21 days before Tuesday, July 6, 2021. No form or other attachment is required. If you will not be arguing, do not file an acknowledgment of hearing notice.[12085814]. [20-16293] (KS) [Entered: 04/25/2021 06:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Filed (ECF) Attorney Mr. Michael S. Catlett for Appellee Mr. Mark Brnovich response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12048779] [20-16293] (Catlett, Michael) [Entered: 03/22/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Filed (ECF) Attorney Lisa T. Hauser for Appellee Maret Vessella response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12048659] [20-16293] (Hauser, Lisa) [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Filed (ECF) Attorney Kathleen Erin Brody for Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, John Canby, Christopher Baird Dupont, Jeffrey A. Kirchler, Richard L. Lougee, Richard D. Randall and Rich Robertson response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12048547] [20-16293] (Brody, Kathleen) [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Filed (ECF) Attorney Nancy Bonnell for Appellee Colonel Heston Silbert response to notice for case being considered for oral argument. Date of service: 03/17/2021. [12045253] [20-16293] (Bonnell, Nancy) [Entered: 03/17/2021 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) David Arthur Lane for party(s) Appellant Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice; Appellant John Canby Appellant Richard L. Lougee Appellant Jeffrey A. Kirchler, in case 20-16293. [11791049] (NAC) [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew Joseph McNulty (Killmer, Lane & Newman, LLP, 1543 Champa St., Ste 400, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice;, John Canby, Christopher Baird Dupont, Jeffrey A. Kirchler, Richard L. Lougee, Richard D. Randall and Rich Robertson. Date of service: 08/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11790989] [20-16293] (McNulty, Andrew) [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Arthur Lane (Killmer, Lane & Newman, LLP, 1543 Champa St, Ste 400, Denver, CO 80202) for Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice;, John Canby, Jeffrey A. Kirchler and Richard L. Lougee. Date of service: 08/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11790977] [20-16293] (Lane, David) [Entered: 08/17/2020 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney Nancy Bonnell for Appellee Frank Milstead, in case 20-16293. [11765881] (HH) [Entered: 07/24/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nancy M. Bonnell (Office of the Attorney General, 2005 North Central Avenue, Phoenix, Arizona 85004) for Appellee Frank Milstead. Date of service: 07/24/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11765754] [20-16293] (Bonnell, Nancy) [Entered: 07/24/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11765289] (VS) [Entered: 07/24/2020 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/09/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11747435]. [20-16293] (AD) [Entered: 07/09/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 07/23/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11747204] (VS) [Entered: 07/09/2020 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice;, John Canby, Christopher Baird Dupont, Jeffrey A. Kirchler, Richard L. Lougee, Rich Robertson and Richard D. Randall Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/09/2020. [11747064] [20-16293] (Brody, Kathleen) [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice;, John Canby, Christopher Baird Dupont, Jeffrey A. Kirchler, Richard L. Lougee, Richard D. Randall and Rich Robertson Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/09/2020. Appellants Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice;, John Canby, Christopher Baird Dupont, Jeffrey A. Kirchler, Richard L. Lougee, Richard D. Randall and Rich Robertson opening brief due 08/31/2020. Appellees Mark Brnovich, Attorney General, Frank Milstead and Maret Vessella answering brief due 10/01/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11741412] (RT) [Entered: 07/02/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen E Brody

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Arthur Lane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Joseph McNulty