This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 06:24:42 (UTC).

Ariel Torres, et al v. Starbucks Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Ariel Torres filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Starbucks Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11215

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

RAPHYR LUBIN

ARIEL TORRES

Defendant / Appellant

STARBUCKS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Chad Andrew Justice

Attorney at Justice for Justice LLC

1205 N Franklin St Ste 326, 33602

Tampa, FL 33602

Luis Antonio Cabassa

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

Brandon Hill

Attorney at Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Sherril Colombo

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Stefanie M. Mederos

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 2700

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 06/08/2021 05:51 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

**Leave to file out of time clerically granted**Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos for Appellant SBUX. [21-11215]--[Edited 06/01/2021 by TLR] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 05/28/2021 06:23 PM]

Open Document

Attorney Sherril Colombo for Appellant SBUX has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 05/27/2021 09:37 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant SBUX. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/25/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/18/2021 04:52 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stefanie M. Mederos for SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:01 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brandon J. Hill for Ariel Torres and Raphyr Lubin Attorney Brandon Hill for Appellees Raphyr Lubin and Ariel Torres. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11215] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 05/10/2021 11:12 AM]

Open Document

Letter regarding inactive status and bar membership renewal issued to attorney Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos for Appellant SBUX. [Entered: 04/29/2021 06:38 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mr. Chad Andrew Justice for Raphyr Lubin and Ariel Torres. [21-11215] (ECF: Chad Justice) [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:19 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos for Appellant SBUX. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 04/26/2021 06:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stefanie M. Mederos for SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 04/26/2021 06:17 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sherril Colombo for SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Sherril Colombo) [Entered: 04/26/2021 06:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandon J. Hill for Ariel Torres and Raphyr Lubin Brandon Hill for Raphyr Lubin and Ariel Torres. [21-11215] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:14 PM]

Open Document #3

Order, DE #33

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant SBUX. [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 06/08/2021 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 06/07/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketORDER: Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Civil Appeal Statement filed by Appellant SBUX is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9398284-2 ] [Entered: 06/01/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket**Leave to file out of time clerically granted**Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos for Appellant SBUX. [21-11215]--[Edited 06/01/2021 by TLR] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 05/28/2021 06:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement form out of time filed by SBUX. Motion is Unopposed. [9398284-1] [21-11215] Corrected docket event text & event--[Edited 06/01/2021 by TLR] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 05/28/2021 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Sherril Colombo for Appellant SBUX has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 05/27/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket14-Day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos for Appellant SBUX. Appellants brief due on 06/08/2021 as to Appellant Starbucks Corporation. Appendix due on 06/15/2021 as to Appellant Starbucks Corporation. [Entered: 05/19/2021 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant SBUX. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/25/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/18/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Rebekah Lockwood, Filer: Starbucks Corporation, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 04/15/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 12/21/2020. [Entered: 05/18/2021 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stefanie M. Mederos for SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brandon J. Hill for Ariel Torres and Raphyr Lubin Attorney Brandon Hill for Appellees Raphyr Lubin and Ariel Torres. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11215] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 05/10/2021 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter regarding inactive status and bar membership renewal issued to attorney Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos for Appellant SBUX. [Entered: 04/29/2021 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mr. Chad Andrew Justice for Raphyr Lubin and Ariel Torres. [21-11215] (ECF: Chad Justice) [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos for Appellant SBUX. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 04/26/2021 06:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stefanie M. Mederos for SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Stefanie Mederos) [Entered: 04/26/2021 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sherril Colombo for SBUX. [21-11215] (ECF: Sherril Colombo) [Entered: 04/26/2021 06:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Luis A. Cabassa for Ariel Torres and Raphyr Lubin Luis Antonio Cabassa for Raphyr Lubin and Ariel Torres. [21-11215] (ECF: Luis Cabassa) [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandon J. Hill for Ariel Torres and Raphyr Lubin Brandon Hill for Raphyr Lubin and Ariel Torres. [21-11215] (ECF: Brandon Hill) [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant SBUX on 04/09/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/26/2021 as to Appellant Starbucks Corporation. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/10/2021 as to Appellee Ariel Torres [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stefanie M. Mederos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherril May Colombo