This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/20/2022 at 06:02:11 (UTC).

Arie Oren v. Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 Arie Oren filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1512

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ARIE OREN

Defendant / Appellees

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

SUPERINTENDENT CAMP HILL SCI

RIVERA, Correctional Officer SCI-Camp Hill

LAGOVINO, Unknown staff member SCI-Camp Hill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael Pileggi Esq.

303 Chestnut Street

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square, 15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Karen M. Romano Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square, 15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

DC Memorandum dated 03/09/2022

1 #3

DC Order dated 03/09/2022

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Court's Standing Order

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, John E. Wetzel, Laurel Harry, Sergeant Rivera and Damien Lagovino.. [22-1512] (HGH) [Entered: 03/30/2022 07:49 PM]

#4

(#4) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael Pileggi, Esq. for Arie Oren requesting the following documents: Appearance Form on or before 04/19/2022. Information Statement on or before 04/19/2022. Concise Summary on or before 04/19/2022. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/19/2022. (AWI) [Entered: 04/05/2022 08:47 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Mr. Arie Oren. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:45 AM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MICHAEL PILEGGI on behalf of Appellant(s) ARIE OREN. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:52 AM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arie Oren. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:54 AM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Mr. Arie Oren advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:55 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Mr. Arie Oren advising this court that no transcripts are available. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arie Oren. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MICHAEL PILEGGI on behalf of Appellant(s) ARIE OREN. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Mr. Arie Oren. [22-1512] (MP) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael Pileggi, Esq. for Arie Oren requesting the following documents: Appearance Form on or before 04/19/2022. Information Statement on or before 04/19/2022. Concise Summary on or before 04/19/2022. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/19/2022. (AWI) [Entered: 04/05/2022 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Howard G Hopkirk on behalf of Appellee(s) Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, John E. Wetzel, Laurel Harry, Sergeant Rivera and Damien Lagovino.. [22-1512] (HGH) [Entered: 03/30/2022 07:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AWI) [Entered: 03/21/2022 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Arie Oren in District Court No. 3-20-cv-02451. (AWI) [Entered: 03/21/2022 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard G. Hopkirk Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Mascio Romano