This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/27/2020 at 03:04:47 (UTC).

Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, et al v. Tribune Media Company, et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Tribune Media Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1183

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

WATER ISLAND MERGER ARBITRAGE INSTITUTIONAL COMMINGLED MASTER FUND, LP

ARBITRAGE EVENT-DRIVEN FUND

ARBITRAGE FUND

FNY MANAGED ACCOUNTS, LLC

FNY PARTNERS FUND LP

Defendant / Appellees

PETER KERN

OAKTREE TRIBUNE, L.P.

TRIBUNE MEDIA COMPANY

MORGAN STANLEY & COMPANY, INCORPORATED

OAKTREE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, L.P.

MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andrew J. Entwistle

Attorney at ENTWISTLE & CAPPUCCI LLP

401 Congress Avenue, Frost Bank Tower

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gerald Meyer

Attorney at MOLOLAMKEN LLP

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654-3423

Mark P. Goodman

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022-3902

Lisa Mazzone

Attorney at FIGLIULO & SILVERMAN, P.C.

Ten S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Gregory F. Laufer

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Andrew J. Ehrlich

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Stacie Marion Fahsel

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

2001 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1047

Peter A. Silverman

Attorney at FIGLIULO & SILVERMAN, P.C.

Ten S. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60603-0000

Charles S. Duggan

Attorney at DAVIS, POLK & WARDWELL

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-0000

Leonard A. Gail

Attorney at MASSEY & GAIL LLP

50 E. Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60602-2100

Antonio Haynes

Attorney at DAVIS, POLK & WARDWELL

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-0000

Suyash Agrawal

Attorney at MASSEY & GAIL LLP

50 E. Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60602-2100

Brian Weinstein

Attorney at DAVIS, POLK & WARDWELL

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-0000

R. Brendan Mooney

Attorney at DAVIS, POLK & WARDWELL

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017-0000

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

RESTRICTED

#25

#24

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

#21

#20

#19

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Arbitrage Fund, FNY Managed Accounts, LLC, FNY Partners Fund LP and Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Commingled Master Fund, LP. Electronically Transmitted. [27] [7081734] [20-1183] Date updated: 05/19/2020 (CM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Submitted appellant reply brief by Andrew J. Entwistle for Appellants Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Arbitrage Fund, FNY Managed Accounts, LLC, FNY Partners Fund LP and Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Commingled Master Fund, LP. [26] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7081692] [20-1183] (Entwistle, Andrew) [Entered: 05/18/2020 10:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Appellee's brief filed by Appellees Oaktree Capital Management, L.P. and Oaktree Tribune, L.P. Electronically Transmitted. [25] [7077369] [20-1183] (GW) [Entered: 04/28/2020 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. Electronically Transmitted. [24] [7077357] [20-1183]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by CMD to correct party name.] (GW) [Entered: 04/28/2020 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Submitted appellee brief by Charles S. Duggan for Appellee Morgan Stanley & Company, Incorporated. [23] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7077324] [20-1183] (Duggan, Charles) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney R. Brendan Mooney for Appellee Morgan Stanley & Company, Incorporated. [22] [7077322] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183]-[Edited 04/28/2020 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Mooney, R.) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Antonio M. Haynes for Appellee Morgan Stanley & Company, Incorporated. [21] [7077321] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Haynes, Antonio) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian S. Weinstein for Appellee Morgan Stanley & Company, Incorporated. [20] [7077319] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183]--[Edited 04/28/2020 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Weinstein, Brian) [Entered: 04/27/2020 07:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Charles S. Duggan for Appellee Morgan Stanley & Company, Incorporated. [19] [7077318] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183] (Duggan, Charles) [Entered: 04/27/2020 07:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Submitted appellee brief by Andrew Ehrlich for Appellees Oaktree Tribune, L.P. and Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. [18] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7077293] [20-1183] (Ehrlich, Andrew) [Entered: 04/27/2020 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Peter A. Silverman, Figliulo & Silverman P.C. for Appellees Oaktree Capital Management, L.P. and Oaktree Tribune, L.P.. [10] [7064269] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183]-[Edited 02/24/2020 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Silverman, Peter) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stacie M. Fahsel for Appellees Oaktree Tribune, L.P. and Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. [9] [7063998] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183]--[Edited 02/21/2020 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Fahsel, Stacie) [Entered: 02/21/2020 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Gregory F. Laufer for Appellees Oaktree Tribune, L.P. and Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. [8] [7063996] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183]--[Edited 02/21/2020 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Laufer, Gregory) [Entered: 02/21/2020 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew J. Ehrlich for Appellees Oaktree Tribune, L.P. and Oaktree Capital Management, L.P.. [7] [7063994] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1183]-[Edited 02/21/2020 by VG - to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Ehrlich, Andrew) [Entered: 02/21/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Mark P. Goodman for Appellees Tribune Media Company and Peter Kern. Additional Parties: Chandler Bigelow, Craig A. Jacobson, Ross Levinsohn, Peter E. Murphy, Laura R. Walker. [6] [7063709] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183]-[Edited 02/20/2020 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Goodman, Mark) [Entered: 02/20/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew J. Entwistle for Appellants Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Arbitrage Fund, FNY Managed Accounts, LLC, FNY Partners Fund LP and Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Commingled Master Fund, LP. [5] [7062064] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1183] (Entwistle, Andrew) [Entered: 02/12/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 03/26/2020 for Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Arbitrage Fund, FNY Managed Accounts, LLC, FNY Partners Fund LP and Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Commingled Master Fund, LP. Appellees' brief due on or before 04/27/2020 for Peter Kern, Morgan Stanley & Company, Incorporated, Oaktree Capital Management, L.P., Oaktree Tribune, L.P. and Tribune Media Company. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/18/2020 for Appellants Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Arbitrage Fund, FNY Managed Accounts, LLC, FNY Partners Fund LP and Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Commingled Master Fund, LP. JNS [7061832] [20-1183] (AG) [Entered: 02/12/2020 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, February 26, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [3] [7061828] [20-1183] (AG) [Entered: 02/12/2020 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Chandler Bigelow, Craig Jacobson, Ross Levinsohn, Peter Murphy and Laura Walker [2] [7060356] [20-1183] (AP) [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/18/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/16/2020 for Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund, Arbitrage Fund, FNY Managed Accounts, LLC, FNY Partners Fund LP and Water Island Merger Arbitrage Institutional Commingled Master Fund, LP [1] [7060355] [20-1183] (AP) [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where WATER ISLAND MERGER ARBITRAGE INSTITUTIONAL COMMINGLED MASTER FUND, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where FNY Partners Fund LP is a litigant