This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/03/2022 at 06:08:18 (UTC).

Aragonite Capital Mkts LLC v. Dark Horse Media LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Aragonite Capital Mkts LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dark Horse Media LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3181

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ARAGONITE CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, dba Argonite Partners LLC

Defendant / Appellees

DARK HORSE MEDIA, LLC

CENIC MEDIA (DELAWARE) INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Shelly R. LaSalvia

Heather E. Heberlein

Kirk William Roessler

Nathaniel Sinn

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Patrick Joseph Gerard Krebs

Daniel Hollis Bryan

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Aragonite Capital Markets LLC. Transcript needed: n. (MTW) [Entered: 03/04/2022 10:42 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/13/2022; appellee brief due 05/13/2022 (MTW) [Entered: 03/04/2022 10:46 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 03/07/2022 11:46 AM]

#5

(#5) VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 04/06/2022 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/14/2022 08:38 AM]

#6

(#6) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 04/20/2022. appellee brief now due 05/20/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 03/14/2022 08:39 AM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Aragonite Capital Markets, LLC by Shelly R. LaSalvia. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2022. [22-3181] (SRL) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:36 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION filed by Ms. Shelly R. LaSalvia for Aragonite Capital Markets, LLC to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2022. [22-3181] (SRL) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:40 PM]

10 #1

Cover Letter

10 #2

Clerk Order-Motion Dismiss R33

#11

(#11) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 04/06/2022 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:57 PM]

 

Docket Entries

03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 04/06/2022 is hereby canceled. (LMR) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:57 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER filed granting motion to dismiss case - mediation [ # 9 ] filed by Ms. Shelly R. LaSalvia.. Entered by order of the court. (LMR) [Entered: 03/18/2022 04:45 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) MOTION filed by Ms. Shelly R. LaSalvia for Aragonite Capital Markets, LLC to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2022. [22-3181] (SRL) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Aragonite Capital Markets, LLC by Shelly R. LaSalvia. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2022. [22-3181] (SRL) [Entered: 03/18/2022 03:36 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - DOCUMENT FILED USING INCORRECT ECF EVENT BY COUNSEL WHO HAS NOT YET APPEARED IN THIS CASE. COUNSEL SHALL FIRST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, THEN REFILE THE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS A MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS THE APPEAL*** Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal by Ms. Shelly R. LaSalvia for Aragonite Capital Markets, LLC. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2022. [22-3181]--[Edited 03/18/2022 by MTW] (SRL) [Entered: 03/18/2022 01:18 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 04/20/2022. appellee brief now due 05/20/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 03/14/2022 08:39 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) VIDEO CONFERENCE: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 04/06/2022 at 9:30 AM (ET) with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/14/2022 08:38 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. VIDEO CONFERENCE: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 2:00 pm EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 03/07/2022 11:46 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/13/2022; appellee brief due 05/13/2022 (MTW) [Entered: 03/04/2022 10:46 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Maria Welker. (MTW) [Entered: 03/04/2022 10:45 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Aragonite Capital Markets LLC. Transcript needed: n. (MTW) [Entered: 03/04/2022 10:42 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less