This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2020 at 06:17:52 (UTC).

Apple Inc. v. Wi-LAN Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 Apple Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Wi-LAN Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2011

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

APPLE INC.

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Cross Appellant

WI-LAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sean C. Cunningham

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

James Anglin Flynn

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Columbia Center

Washington, DC 20005

Mark S. Davies Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Columbia Center

Washington, DC 20005

Stanley Joseph Panikowski III

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Katherine M. Kopp

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Columbia Center

Washington, DC 20005

Erin Gibson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Ashley Nicole Moore

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant / Cross Appellant Attorneys

Leonid Grinberg

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

430 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Lucas M. Walker

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Jeffrey A. Lamken

Attorney at MoloLamken LLP

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Mike McKool

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 Crescent Court

Dallas, TX 75201

Rayiner Hashem

600 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Brett E. Cooper

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

One Manhattan West, 395 9Th Avenue

New York, NY 10001-8603

Scott Cole

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC

300 W 6Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. The opening brief is due 11/20/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [721634] [KMH] [Entered: 09/15/2020 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION of Appellant Apple Inc. to extend the time to 11/20/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/14/2020 by email. [721397] [20-2011] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Amended Entry of appearance for Mark S. Davies; Katherine M. Kopp; James Anglin Flynn; Sean C. Cunningham; Stanley J. Panikowski; Erin P. Gibson as counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 09/11/2020 by email. [721091] [20-2011] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corrected Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken; Lucas M. Walker; Rayiner I. Hashem; Leonid Grinberg; Mike McCool; Scott Cole; Brett Cooper as counsel for Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/10/2020 by email. [713912] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/10/2020 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc., Entry of Appearance [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/14/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [713345] [KMH] [Entered: 08/07/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712569] [20-2011] [Sean Cunningham] [Entered: 08/04/2020 09:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712568] [20-2011] [Sean Cunningham] [Entered: 08/04/2020 09:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Sean C. Cunningham; Stanley J. Panikowski; Erin P. Gibson as counsel for Appellant Apple Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712567] [20-2011] [Sean Cunningham] [Entered: 08/04/2020 09:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712543] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712541] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Jeffrey A. Lamken; Lucas M. Walker; Rayiner I. Hashem; Leonid Grinberg; Mike McCool; Scott Cole; Brett Cooper as counsel for Cross-Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 08/04/2020 by email. [712321] [20-2011] [Jeffrey Lamken] [Entered: 08/04/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal 20-2094. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [711111] [KMH] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 20-2011 Lead with 20-2094 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [711110] [20-2011, 20-2094] [KMH] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/15/2020. [708806] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/04/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/04/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 08/04/2020. Appellant's brief is due on 09/21/2020. [KMH] [Entered: 07/21/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WI-LAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett E. Cooper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Cole