This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2021 at 05:18:36 (UTC).

Apple Inc. v. Roslyn Hazlitt, et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Apple Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Roslyn Hazlitt. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-8019

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

APPLE INC.

Respondents

ROSLYN HAZLITT

RICHARD ROBINSON

YOLANDA BROWN

JANE DOE, a minor, by and through next friend JOHN DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Raj N. Shah

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

444 W. Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Eric M. Roberts

Attorney at DLA PIPER LLP (US)

444 W. Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Stanley J. Panikowski III

Attorney at DLA PIPER US LLP

401 B Street

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

Respondent Attorney

Andrew D. Schlichter

Attorney at SCHLICHTER, BOGARD & DENTON, LLP

100 S. Fourth Street

St. Louis, MO 63102-0000

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER re: Petition for permission to appeal from remand order. IT IS ORDERED that respondents shall file an answer to the petition on or before July 9, 2021. The parties should address the potential bearing of TransUnion LLC v. Ramirez, No. 20-297 (U.S. June 25, 2021), and should address the question whether 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) permits an appeal from a district courts decision to remand one legal theory or claim while retaining jurisdiction of other theories or claims. [3] [7169298] [21-8019] (AG) [Entered: 06/25/2021 02:51 PM]

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Mr. Stanley J. Panikowski, III, Eric M. Roberts, and Mr. Raj N. Shah for Petitioner Apple Inc.. [2] [7169207] [21-8019] (PS) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:31 AM]

#1

(#1) Petition for Permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) docketed. [1] [7169204] [21-8019] (PS) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:28 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re: Petition for permission to appeal from remand order. IT IS ORDERED that respondents shall file an answer to the petition on or before July 9, 2021. The parties should address the potential bearing of TransUnion LLC v. Ramirez, No. 20-297 (U.S. June 25, 2021), and should address the question whether 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) permits an appeal from a district courts decision to remand one legal theory or claim while retaining jurisdiction of other theories or claims. [3] [7169298] [21-8019] (AG) [Entered: 06/25/2021 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Mr. Stanley J. Panikowski, III, Eric M. Roberts, and Mr. Raj N. Shah for Petitioner Apple Inc.. [2] [7169207] [21-8019] (PS) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) docketed. [1] [7169204] [21-8019] (PS) [Entered: 06/25/2021 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raj N Shah

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric M. Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stanley Joseph Panikowski III