This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/04/2020 at 08:56:20 (UTC).

Apple Inc. v. INVT SPE LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Apple Inc filed an Other lawsuit against INVT SPE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1859

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

ZTE (USA) INC.

APPLE INC.

HTC AMERICA, INC.

HTC CORPORATION

Appellee

INVT SPE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Adam Prescott Seitz

Attorney at Erise IP, P.A.

7015 College Boulevard, Suite 700

Overland Park, KS 66211

Stephen S. Korniczky

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

12275 El Camino Real, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

Appellee Attorney

Cyrus Alcorn Morton

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2800 Lasalle Plaza, 800 Lasalle Avenue

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/27/2020. [698811] Entry of Appearance is due 06/17/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/17/2020. Docketing Statement is due 06/17/2020. Certified List is due on 07/13/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 06/03/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HTC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ZTE (USA), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where INVT SPE LLC is a litigant