This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2019 at 06:03:40 (UTC).

Apartment Rental Assistance v. Heatherton Drive, L.P.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Apartment Rental Assistance filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Heatherton Drive, L P. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3913

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

HEATHERTON DRIVE, L.P.

Plaintiff / Appellant

APARTMENT RENTAL ASSISTANCE, II, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew H. King

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs

41 S. High Street, Suite 2000

Columbus, OH 43215

C. Craig Woods

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs

41 S. High Street, Suite 2000

Columbus, OH 43215

Jesse Taylor

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs

41 S. High Street, 2000 Huntington Center

Columbus, OH 43215

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Kenneth Chase

Attorney at Law Offices

1509 16Th Street, N.W., Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/30/2019; appellee brief due 01/29/2020. (REO) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:42 PM]

17 #2

Clerk Order-Reinstate Case

16 #1

motion

15 #2

Additional Document

15 #1

motion

13 #2

Clerk Order-Dism Want Of Prosecution

13 #1

Cover Letter

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Kenneth Chase for Appellant Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2019. [19-3913] (KC) [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:07 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. by Kenneth E. Chase. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2019. [19-3913] (KC) [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:06 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. by Jesse Taylor. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-3913] (JT) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:59 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. by Andrew H. King. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-3913] (AHK) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:56 AM]

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. C. Craig Woods for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-3913] (CCW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 03:51 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. by C. Craig Woods. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-3913] (CCW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:50 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Robert Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:57 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/30/2019; appellee brief due 01/29/2020. (REO) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER filed granting motion to reinstate case [ # 16 ] filed by Mr. Kenneth Chase. (REO) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION filed by Mr. Kenneth Chase for Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. to reinstate case. Certificate of Service: 11/19/2019. [19-3913] (KC) [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ***LOCKED - please refile using correct case number*** MOTION filed by Mr. Kenneth Chase for Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. to reinstate case. Certificate of Service: 11/18/2019. [19-3913]--[Edited 11/19/2019 by REO] (KC) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Kenneth Chase for Appellant Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. Certificate of Service:11/08/2019. [19-3913] (KC) [Entered: 11/08/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER filed to dismiss for want of prosecution. Failure to pay fee or file IFP form and failure to file Civil Appeal Statement of Parties and Issues. (REO) [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • (#12) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Kenneth Chase for Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 10/24/2019. [19-3913] (KC) [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#11) NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed. If not completed by 10/25/2019 further action will be taken. (REO) [Entered: 10/22/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Kenneth Chase for Appellant Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2019. [19-3913] (KC) [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc. by Kenneth E. Chase. Certificate of Service: 10/21/2019. [19-3913] (KC) [Entered: 10/21/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. by Jesse Taylor. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-3913] (JT) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. by Andrew H. King. Certificate of Service: 10/11/2019. [19-3913] (AHK) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. C. Craig Woods for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-3913] (CCW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Heatherton Drive, L.P. by C. Craig Woods. Certificate of Service: 10/09/2019. [19-3913] (CCW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Robert Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 09/25/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Apartment Rental Assistance, II, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 09/25/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.