This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 06:02:51 (UTC).

Antony Murrell v. Charles Ryan, et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Antony Murrell filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Charles Ryan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16360

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

VILLMA BURKE, RN

ANDREW, First Name Unknown; named as Jon Doe Andrew

BURKE, First Name Unknown; named as Jon Doe Burke

ANDREW, First Name Unknown; RN

SHUMAN, First Name Unknown; ADW

SHUMAN, First Name Unknown; named as Jane Doe Shuman

KABONGO, First Name Unknown; named as Jon Doe Kabongo

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTONY T. MURRELL

Florence, AZ 85232-5000

Defendant / Appellees

CORLISS, First Name Unknown; named as Mrs. Corliss, Director of Nursing

DOROTHY IGWE, NP

PERKINS, First Name Unknown; named as Jane Doe Perkins

UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Allen Lesli or Lesli Allen

ADAM PERKINS, FHA

RYAN, First Name Unknown; Jane Doe Ryan

ARTEMISA CORDOVA

CORDOVA, First Name Unknown; named as Jane or John Doe Cordova

IGWE, First Name Unknown; named as Jon Doe

CHARLES L. RYAN

UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Jane or John Doe Lesli or Allen

CORIZON HEALTH SERVICES

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Antony T. Murrell

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - FLORENCE

P.O. Box 5000

Florence, AZ 85232-5000

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Antony T. Murrell supplemental brief (Informal: No) 9 pages. Served on 08/30/2019. Major deficiencies: motions pending. [11423255] (SML) [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:24 AM]

7 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

7 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Antony T. Murrell opening brief (Informal: Yes) 6 pages. Served on 07/13/2019. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11373190] (KWG) [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:43 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed Appellant Antony T. Murrell FORM 24 motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/13/2019. [11372235] (RL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:37 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Antony T. Murrell FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/13/2019. [11372227] (RL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:36 PM]

#3

(#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 07/18/2019. [Case Number 19-16360: Partially Paid] [11372219] (RL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:34 PM]

#2

(#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11363465] (CKP) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:09 PM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Antony T. Murrell supplemental brief (Informal: No) 9 pages. Served on 08/30/2019. Major deficiencies: motions pending. [11423255] (SML) [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11373342] (CKP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Antony T. Murrell opening brief (Informal: Yes) 6 pages. Served on 07/13/2019. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11373190] (KWG) [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed Appellant Antony T. Murrell FORM 24 motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/13/2019. [11372235] (RL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Antony T. Murrell FORM 4 motion and affidavit for permission to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/13/2019. [11372227] (RL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 07/18/2019. [Case Number 19-16360: Partially Paid] [11372219] (RL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11363465] (CKP) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Antony T. Murrell opening brief due 09/09/2019. [11360239] (JMR) [Entered: 07/11/2019 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.