This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2019 at 06:07:41 (UTC).

Antonio Thomas v. Dennis Grimes, et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 Antonio Thomas filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Dennis Grimes. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30212

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

ANTONIO THOMAS

Defendant / Appellants

DENNIS GRIMES, Warden

UNKNOWN DANIELS, Deputy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Joseph Jerome Long

251 Florida Street, Taylor Building

Baton Rouge, LA 70801-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Tara L. Johnston

Attorney at Erlingson Banks, P.L.L.C.

301 Main Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Mary G. Erlingson Esq.

Attorney at Erlingson Banks, P.L.L.C.

301 Main Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Catherine Susan St. Pierre

Attorney at Erlingson Banks, P.L.L.C.

301 Main Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/13/2019 for Appellants Daniels and Dennis Grimes. [19-30212] (DDL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:01 AM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellants NFN Daniels and Mr. Dennis Grimes. [19-30212] (SEP) [Entered: 03/15/2019 01:23 PM]

Open Document

OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants NFN Daniels and Dennis Grimes to extend time to file brief as appellants until 06/03/2019 [9048405-2]. [19-30212] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants NFN Daniels and Mr. Dennis Grimes for filing Appellant-Defendant Brief until 06/03/2019 [19-30212] (Tara L. Johnston ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30212] (Mary G. Erlingson ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:54 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9012877-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30212] (SEP) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:17 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Tara L. Johnston for NFN Daniels and Mr. Dennis Grimes for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30212] (Tara L. Johnston ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:42 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30212] (Catherine Susan St. Pierre ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting in part opposed motion to extend time to file appellants' brief to and including 5/28/19 filed by Appellants Mr. Dennis Grimes and NFN Daniels [ # 9048405-2 ]. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/28/2019 for Appellants Daniels and Dennis Grimes [19-30212] (MCS) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:54 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joseph Jerome Long for Mr. Antonio Thomas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30212] (Joseph Jerome Long ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:15 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting in part opposed motion to extend time to file appellants' brief to and including 5/28/19 filed by Appellants Mr. Dennis Grimes and NFN Daniels [ # 9048405-2 ]. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/28/2019 for Appellants Daniels and Dennis Grimes [19-30212] (MCS) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants NFN Daniels and Dennis Grimes to extend time to file brief as appellants until 06/03/2019 [9048405-2]. [19-30212] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants NFN Daniels and Mr. Dennis Grimes for filing Appellant-Defendant Brief until 06/03/2019 [19-30212] (Tara L. Johnston ) [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joseph Jerome Long for Appellee Antonio Thomas in 19-30212. [19-30212] (MCS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joseph Jerome Long for Mr. Antonio Thomas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30212] (Joseph Jerome Long ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Catherine Susan St Pierre for party(s) Appellant Daniels Appellant Dennis Grimes, in case 19-30212 [19-30212] (CB) [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30212] (Catherine Susan St. Pierre ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Mary G. Erlingson for party(s) Appellant Daniels Appellant Dennis Grimes, in case 19-30212 [19-30212] (MCS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Tara L. Johnston for Appellant Daniels in 19-30212, Attorney Tara L. Johnston for Appellant Dennis Grimes in 19-30212 [19-30212] (MCS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30212] (Mary G. Erlingson ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Tara L. Johnston for NFN Daniels and Mr. Dennis Grimes for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30212] (Tara L. Johnston ) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/13/2019 for Appellants Daniels and Dennis Grimes. [19-30212] (DDL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30212] (DDL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-77. Electronic ROA due on 04/09/2019. [19-30212] (SEP) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9012877-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30212] (SEP) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellants NFN Daniels and Mr. Dennis Grimes. [19-30212] (SEP) [Entered: 03/15/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.