This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2020 at 06:17:29 (UTC).

Anton Thompson v. CIA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Anton Thompson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CIA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5638

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHRISTINE RUPPERT, Acting Deputy Inspector General

CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTON LAMONT THOMPSON

Madison, TN 37115

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anton Lamont Thompson

714 Due West Avenue, North, J-134

Madison, TN 37115

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee of $505 to district court or renew motion for pauper status and financial affidavit with the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals on or before September 2, 2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 08/03/2020 02:15 PM]

#10

(#10) Copy of District Court Order filed 08/03/20 denying in forma pauperis. (RLJ) [Entered: 08/03/2020 02:13 PM]

9 #3

Additional Document

9 #2

Additional Document

9 #1

appellant motion filed

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION filed by Anton Lamont Thompson regarding that plaintiff is submitting the Bivens lawsuit. Certificate of Service: 06/11/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:48 PM]

7 #2

Additional Document

7 #1

(pub) miscellaneous correspondence

6 #3

Additional Document

6 #2

letter sent

6 #1

Letter

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

appellant motion filed

#4

(#4) Copy of District Court Order filed 06/15/20 denying plaintiff's Rule 59 motion. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:33 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Anton Lamont Thompson. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:58 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee of $505 to district court or renew motion for pauper status and financial affidavit with the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals on or before September 2, 2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 08/03/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Copy of District Court Order filed 08/03/20 denying in forma pauperis. (RLJ) [Entered: 08/03/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Appellant MOTION filed by Anton Lamont Thompson to take judicial notice. Certificate of service: 07/24/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTIFICATION filed by Anton Lamont Thompson regarding that plaintiff is submitting the Bivens lawsuit. Certificate of Service: 06/11/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRESPONDENCE: copy of record entry 1 complaint filed in the Middle District of Tennessee at Nashville by Anton Lamont Thompson - no cover letter sent. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER SENT to Anton Lamont Thompson, returning unfiled ifp motion and affidavit. These documents must be filed in district court and a ruling issued before they can be filed in the Sixth Circuit. No ruling will issue on his motion for a new trial until the fee issue is resolved. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/06/2020 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Appellant MOTION filed by Anton Lamont Thompson for a new trial. Certificate of service: 06/28/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 07/06/2020 08:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Copy of District Court Order filed 06/15/20 denying plaintiff's Rule 59 motion. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/17/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 06/17/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Anton Lamont Thompson. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 06/17/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central Intelligence Agency Inc. is a litigant