This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2022 at 06:05:29 (UTC).

Anthony Weimer v. Microsoft Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Anthony Weimer filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Microsoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-35246

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ANTHONY CRAIG WEIMER

Kalispell, MT 59901

ANTHONY C. WEIMER

Kalispell, MT 59901

Defendant / Appellees

MICROSOFT CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation

GOOGLE, INC., a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Anthony Craig Weimer

350 N Meridian Road, P.O. Box 10801

Kalispell, MT 59901

Anthony C. Weimer

350 N Meridian Road, P.O. Box 10801

Kalispell, MT 59901

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nathan Bilyeu

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 North Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601

Simon J. Frankel Esquire

Attorney at Covington & Burling, LLP

415 Mission Street, Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

Breanna Katherine Jones

Attorney at Covington & Burling, LLP

415 Mission Street, Suite 5400

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

Murry Warhank

Attorney at JACKSON, MURDO & GRANT, P.C.

203 North Ewing Street

Helena, MT 59601

Michael J. Hofmann

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203

Paul J. Lopach

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

#2

Main Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Anthony C. Weimer Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 03/24/22. [12408139] (JFF) [Entered: 03/30/2022 08:53 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/29/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12408690]. [22-35246] (AD) [Entered: 03/30/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Appellant Anthony C. Weimer Mediation Questionnaire. Served on 03/24/22. [12408139] (JFF) [Entered: 03/30/2022 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 03/25/2022. [12405234] (RT) [Entered: 03/25/2022 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12404108] (CKP) [Entered: 03/24/2022 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 04/20/2022. Transcript due 05/20/2022. Appellant Anthony Craig Weimer opening brief due 06/29/2022. Appellees Google, Inc. and Microsoft Corporation answering brief due 07/29/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12401828] (RT) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microsoft Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Hofmann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Murry Warhank