This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/29/2020 at 06:10:40 (UTC).

Anthony Solis v. Charles Ryan, et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Anthony Solis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Charles Ryan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-17140

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CORIZON, Medical Provider Corizon at Browning Unit, Eyman Complex

ACOSTA, Corrections Officer 2 Eyman Complex

MAUREEN JOHNSON, F.H.A. at ASPC Eyman - Browning Unit Medical

CHARLES L. RYAN, Director of Arizona Department of Corrections

UNKNOWN PARTY, Correction Officer at Eyman Complex

M. JOHNSON, Facility Health Administrator at Eyman Complex

ROWE, Sergeant

UNKOWN PARTY, Medical Provider at ASPC Eyman - Browning Medical

UNKNOWN PARTY, Corrections Officer at ASPC Eyman, Browning Unit

A. ACOSTA, Corrections Officer at ASPC Eyman, Browning Unit

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY LOZANO SOLIS

Florence, AZ 85132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony Lozano Solis

Attorney at ASPC - ARIZONA STATE PRISON COMPLEX - EYMAN

P.O. Box 3400

Florence, AZ 85132

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael E. Gottfried

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Neil Singh

Attorney at Arizona Attorney General's Office

2005 N. Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Anthony Lozano Solis opening brief of 12 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 12/22/2020. [11937376] (KT) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:48 PM]

9 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

9 #1

Main Document

#8

(#8) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 11/29/2020. [Case Number 20-17140: Partially Paid] [11914456] (JFF) [Entered: 12/03/2020 03:37 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Anthony Lozano Solis letter dated re: questions on case and request. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11899587] (JFF) [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:57 PM]

#4

(#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11895099] (CKP) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:36 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Anthony Lozano Solis motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11882260] (JFF) [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:29 PM]

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11877738] (JFF) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:11 PM]

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Anthony Lozano Solis opening brief of 12 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 12/22/2020. [11937376] (KT) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11915352] (CKP) [Entered: 12/04/2020 01:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 11/29/2020. [Case Number 20-17140: Partially Paid] [11914456] (JFF) [Entered: 12/03/2020 03:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Appellant Anthony Lozano Solis letter dated re: questions on case and request. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11899587] (JFF) [Entered: 11/19/2020 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#6) Attorneys Michael E. Gottfried in 20-17140 substituted by Attorney Neil Singh in 20-17140 [11896432] (RR) [Entered: 11/17/2020 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Neil Singh (Arizona Attorney General's Office, 2005 N. Central Ave., Phoenix, AZ 85004-2926) for Appellees A. Acosta and Rowe. Substitution for Attorney Michael E. Gottfried for Appellees A. Acosta and Rowe. Date of service: 11/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11895854] [20-17140] (Singh, Neil) [Entered: 11/17/2020 12:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11895099] (CKP) [Entered: 11/17/2020 05:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Appellant Anthony Lozano Solis motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11882260] (JFF) [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11877738] (JFF) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Anthony Lozano Solis opening brief due 12/28/2020. Appellees Charles L. Ryan, et al. answering brief due 01/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11876827] (JPD) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHARLES L. RYAN, Director of Arizona Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Singh(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael E. Gottfried