This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

Anthony Smith, et al v. City of Janesville, et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Anthony Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Janesville. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3282

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JIMMY G. HOLFORD, III

DAVID J. MOORE

JOEL P. MELTON

CITY OF JANESVILLE

JIMMY G. HOLFORD, JR.

Plaintiff / Appellants

ANTHONY SMITH

FLYING A.J.'S TOWING COMPANY, LLC, a Wisconsin limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Ann C. Wirth

Attorney at GUNTA LAW OFFICES, S.C.

9898 W. Bluemound Road

Wauwatosa, WI 53226

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Allen Steven Porter

7818 Big Sky Drive

Madison, WI 53719-0000

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [4] RJS [7051007] [19-3282] (AG) [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:22 PM]

#1

Civil Case

#3

(#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 01/21/2020 for Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. Appellees' brief due on or before 02/19/2020 for City of Janesville, Jimmy G. Holford III, Jimmy G. Holford Jr., Joel P. Melton and David J. Moore. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/11/2020 for Appellants Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. RJS [7046801] [19-3282] (CG) [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:15 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday December 18, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [2] [7046798] [19-3282] (CG) [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:11 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [4] RJS [7051007] [19-3282] (AG) [Entered: 12/18/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 01/21/2020 for Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. Appellees' brief due on or before 02/19/2020 for City of Janesville, Jimmy G. Holford III, Jimmy G. Holford Jr., Joel P. Melton and David J. Moore. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/11/2020 for Appellants Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. RJS [7046801] [19-3282] (CG) [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday December 18, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [2] [7046798] [19-3282] (CG) [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/30/2019 for Flying A.J.'s Towing Company, LLC and Anthony Smith. Transcript information sheet due by 12/02/2019. [1] [7044442] [19-3282] (VG) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.