This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2020 at 06:07:11 (UTC).

Anthony Patel v. Patricia Miller, et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Anthony Patel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Patricia Miller. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-56285

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendants

SIDLEY & AUSTIN

EISNER JAFFE

LYNNE MCCULLOUGH

HINSHAW AND CULBERTSON LLP

MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

DESMOND J. HINDS

CLAUDIA LINN STONE

MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS

SARAH L. OVERTON

AKERMAN LLP

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

MEYER OLSON LOWY AND MEYERS

NEMECEK AND COLE

AKSHAI RUNCHAL

GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

CLAUDIA LINN STONE

DECAROLIS FAMILY LAW GROUP

PARUL BHATIA

CHARLES ROBINSON, General Counsel University of California Office of the President

MCLA PSYCHIATRIC MEDICAL GROUP

TROPE FEIN

DIVYA RUNCHAL

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Patrick M. Maloney

Attorney at The Maloney Firm, APC

2381 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 405

El Segundo, CA 90245

Mark Schaeffer

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

Alexander Smith

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Filomena E. Meyer

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jeremy James Osher

Attorney at Boren, Osher & Luftman, LLP

222 North Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 2222

El Segundo, CA 90245

Patricia E. Ellyatt

Attorney at MARANGA & MORGENSTERN

5850 Canoga Avenue, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Other Attorneys

Zachary Schwake

Attorney at LAW AND BRANDMEYER LLP

2 North Lake Avenue, Suite 820

Pasadena, CA 91101

Brett A. Boon Esquire

Attorney at The Boon Law Firm

411 Camino Del Rio S., Suite 106

San Diego, CA 92108-3508

Morgan Ashleigh Metzger Esquire

Attorney at MARANGA & MORGENSTERN

5850 Canoga Avenue, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Gregory P. Korn

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Howard N. Wollitz

Attorney at Charlston, Revich & Wollitz LLP

1925 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2746

Timothy Donahoe

Attorney at Donahoe & Young

16000 Ventura Boulevard, Fifth Foor

Encino, CA 91436

Craig Benner Esquire

Attorney at Benner Law Firm

411 Camino Del Rio S, Suite 106

San Diego, CA 92108

Jon R. Schwalbach

Attorney at Kjar McKenna and Stockalper LLP

841 Apollo Street, Suite 100

El Segundo, CA 90245

Kenneth Maranga Esquire

Attorney at MARANGA & MORGENSTERN

5850 Canoga Avenue, Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Joan E. Trimble

Attorney at Callahan, Thompson, Sherman & Caudill, LLP

2601 Main Street, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Anthony A. Patel

Attorney at Tony Patel Inc.

11693 San Vicente Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90049

David E. Azar

Attorney at Milberg LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3149

Dana Stenvick

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2670 Mission St.

San Marino, CA 91108

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#2

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • (#10) Streamlined request [9] by Appellant Anthony A. Patel to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Anthony A. Patel opening brief due 03/13/2020. Appellees Lukas Alexanian, Bartley L. Becker, Benner and Boon LLP, Parul Bhatia, Raksha Bhatia, Sumeet Bhatia, Blank Rome LLP, Boren, Osher and Luftman LLP, Buter, Buzard, Fishbein & Royce, LLP, Jaffe Clemens, Decarolis Family Law Group, Dickstein Shapiro LLP, Trope Fein, Greenberg Traurig LLP, Jordan D. Grotzinger, Health Information Management Services, Gregory Hendey, Eisner Jaffee, Johanna Klohn, Law and Brandmeyer, LLP, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, Gregory G. Lynch, MCLA Psychiatric Medical Group, John C. Mazziotta, Rachel McRoskey, Meyer Olson Lowy and Meyers, Patricia Miller, Nemecek and Cole, Douglas Nies, Jeremy James Osher, Regents of the University of California, Charles Robinson, Akshai Runchal, Amit Runchal, Divya Runchal, Joel Sachs, Schmid and Voiles, Silver Law Group, State Bar of California, Atilla Uner and Wasser, Cooperman and Mandles, PC answering brief due 04/13/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11526661] (JN) [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Anthony A. Patel. New requested due date is 03/13/2020. [11526561] [19-56285] (Patel, Anthony) [Entered: 12/10/2019 12:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • (#8) Added Attorney(s) Marco A. Pulido, Mary-Christine Sungaila for party(s) Appellee Patricia Miller Appellee Johanna Klohn Appellee John C. Mazziotta Appellee Atilla Uner Appellee Regents of the University of California Appellee Gregory Hendey Appellee Charles Robinson, in case 19-56285. [11521596] (QDL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • (#7) Terminated Mark Schaeffer for Claudia Linn Stone, Frank W. Nemecek and Jonathan Berres Cole in 19-56285 [11521565] (TYL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mary-Christine Sungaila (Haynes and Boone, LLP, 600 Anton Blvd, Suite 700, Costa Mesa CA 92626) for Appellees Regents of the University of California, Gregory Hendey, Patricia Miller, Johanna Klohn, Atilla Uner, Charles Robinson and John C. Mazziotta. Date of service: 12/04/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11521522] [19-56285] (Sungaila, Mary-Christine) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marco A Pulido (Haynes and Boone, LLP, 600 Anton Blvd, Suite 700, Costa Mesa CA 92626) for Appellees Regents of the University of California, Gregory Hendey, Patricia Miller, Johanna Klohn, Atilla Uner, Charles Robinson and John C. Mazziotta. Date of service: 12/04/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11521497] [19-56285] (Pulido, Marco) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): The request to correct the docket to reflect that Frank W. Nemeck, Claudia Linn Stone, and Jonathan Berres Cole are not defendants-appellees in this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is granted. See 9th Cir. Gen. Ord. Appendix A (29). The Clerk will update the docket to designate Frank W. Nemeck, Claudia Linn Stone, and Jonathan Berres Cole as defendants rather than defendants-appellees. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11521473] (HC) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#3) Mail returned on 11/18/2019 addressed to Timothy Donahoe for Jeremy James Osher, Rachel McRoskey and Boren, Osher and Luftman LLP, re: 11/07/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, insufficient address, unable to forward. Resending to: Donahoe & Young, 16133 Ventura Boulevard, 7th Floor, Encino, CA 91436-2403. [11503152]--[Edited: address updated. 11/19/2019 by SLM] (QDL) [Entered: 11/18/2019 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellee Nemecek and Cole Correspondence: Request that this court correct its record/docket to reflect that Frank W. Nemecek, Claudia Linn Stone, and Jonathan Berres Cole are not appellees.. Date of service: 11/14/2019 [11499246] [19-56285] (Schaeffer, Mark) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 12/04/2019. Transcript due 01/03/2020. Appellant Anthony A. Patel opening brief due 02/12/2020. Appellees Lukas Alexanian, Bartley L. Becker, Benner and Boon LLP, Parul Bhatia, Raksha Bhatia, Sumeet Bhatia, Blank Rome LLP, Boren, Osher and Luftman LLP, Buter, Buzard, Fishbein & Royce, LLP, Jaffe Clemens, Jonathan Berres Cole, Decarolis Family Law Group, Dickstein Shapiro LLP, Trope Fein, Greenberg Traurig LLP, Jordan D. Grotzinger, Health Information Management Services, Gregory Hendey, Eisner Jaffee, Johanna Klohn, Law and Brandmeyer, LLP, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, Gregory G. Lynch, MCLA Psychiatric Medical Group, John C. Mazziotta, Rachel McRoskey, Meyer Olson Lowy and Meyers, Patricia Miller, Frank W. Nemecek, Nemecek and Cole, Douglas Nies, Jeremy James Osher, Regents of the University of California, Charles Robinson, Akshai Runchal, Amit Runchal, Divya Runchal, Joel Sachs, Schmid and Voiles, Silver Law Group, State Bar of California, Claudia Linn Stone, Atilla Uner and Wasser, Cooperman and Mandles, PC answering brief due 03/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11492959] (JBS) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Munger Tolles and Olson LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Sidley Austin LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Akerman LLP is a litigant