This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:25:09 (UTC).

Anthony Mina v. Chester County, et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 Anthony Mina filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Chester County. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1001

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

TOWNSHIP OF EAST GOSHEN

Defendant / Appellees

DAWSON R. MUTH, ATTORNEY

MARK A. MURRAY

WILLIAM HANDY, CHESTER COUNTY COURT REPORTER

MICHAEL COTTER, WEST CHESTER, PA BOROUGH MANAGER

JAMES BILOTTA, EAST WHITELAND OFFICER

DA THOMAS P. HOGAN

BOROUGH OF WEST CHESTER

LEONARD J. RIVERA, Esq., ATTORNEY

CHESTER COUNTY

WILLIAM KRAUT, DISTRICT JUDGE

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY STOCKER MINA

Malvern, PA 19355

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Guy A. Donatelli Esq.

Attorney at Lamb McErlane

24 East Market Street, P.O. Box 565

West Chester, PA 19381

Suzanne McDonough Esq.

Attorney at Holsten & Associates

One Olive Street

Media, PA 19063

Kathleen G. Byrne Esq.

Attorney at MacMain Law Group

433 West Market Street, Suite 200

West Chester, PA 19382

David J. MacMain Esq.

Attorney at MacMain Law Group

433 West Market Street, Suite 200

West Chester, PA 19382

Brian P. Gabriel Esq.

Attorney at Campbell Durrant Beatty Palombo & Miller

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 700

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

John P. McLaughlin Esq.

Attorney at Campbell Durrant Beatty Palombo & Miller

One Belmont Avenue, Suite 605

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Carolyn N. Flynn Esq.

Attorney at Siana Bellwoar & McAndrew

941 Pottstown Pike, Suite 200

Chester Springs, PA 19425

Christopher P. Gerber Esq.

Attorney at Siana Bellwoar & McAndrew

941 Pottstown Pike, Suite 200

Chester Springs, PA 19425

Jeffrey P. Lewis Esq.

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott

50 South 16Th Street, Two Liberty Place, 22Nd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Martha Gale Esq.

Attorney at Administrative Office of Pennsylvania Courts

1515 Market Street, Suite 1414

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony Stocker Mina

100 Bridge Street

Malvern, PA 19355

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motions and response are considered. The motions and response are referred to a motions panel. The briefing and scheduling order is hereby stayed pending the disposition of the motions. If the motions to quash the appeal or to remand to the District Court are denied or referred tot he merits panel, Appellant's brief and appendix must be filed and served within 30 days of the date of the order denying or referring the motions, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:38 AM]

Open Document #4

Exhibit 3

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #1

Letter to the Court (Information Purposes Only)

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen G. Byrne on behalf of Appellee(s) Tom Hogan, William Handy and Chester County. [19-1001] (KGB) [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:47 AM]

Open Document #12

Brief

Open Document #11

Exhibit 9

Open Document #10

Exhibit 8

Open Document #9

Exhibit 7

Open Document #8

Exhibit 6

Open Document #7

Exhibit 5

Open Document #6

Exhibit 4

Open Document #5

Exhibit 3

Open Document #4

Exhibit 2

Open Document #3

Exhibit 1

Open Document #2

MacElree Harvey's Obstruction of Justice

Open Document #1

Response

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motions and response are considered. The motions and response are referred to a motions panel. The briefing and scheduling order is hereby stayed pending the disposition of the motions. If the motions to quash the appeal or to remand to the District Court are denied or referred tot he merits panel, Appellant's brief and appendix must be filed and served within 30 days of the date of the order denying or referring the motions, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: LETTER from Party Anthony Stocker Mina APPELLANTS NOTICE TO THE 3RD CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS THAT THE U.S. EASTERN DISTRICT COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND JUDGE PAPPERT ARE CURRENTLY COMMITTING OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE AND TAMPERING WITH EVIDENCE CRIMES BY REFUSING TO FILE THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS.... Certificate of Service dated 02/19/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1001] (ASM) [Entered: 02/19/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathleen G. Byrne on behalf of Appellee(s) Tom Hogan, William Handy and Chester County. [19-1001] (KGB) [Entered: 02/19/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Anthony Stocker Mina to motion to dismiss/quash case. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2019. [19-1001] (ASM) [Entered: 02/15/2019 11:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Anthony Stocker Mina for full remand, to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 02/15/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1001] (ASM) [Entered: 02/15/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellee Leonard J. Rivera, Esq. dismiss/quash case. Certificate of Service dated 02/08/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1001] (JPL) [Entered: 02/08/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John P. McLaughlin, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Borough of West Chester and Michael Cotter. [19-1001] (JPM) [Entered: 01/22/2019 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Anthony Stocker Mina due on or before 02/27/2019. Appendix due on or before 02/27/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian P. Gabriel on behalf of Appellee(s) Borough of West Chester and Michael Cotter. [19-1001] (BPG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David J. MacMain on behalf of Appellee(s) Tom Hogan, William Handy and Chester County. [19-1001] (DJM) [Entered: 01/15/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher P. Gerber, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Officer James Bilotta. [19-1001] (CPG) [Entered: 01/08/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Carolyn N. Flynn, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Officer James Bilotta. [19-1001] (CNF) [Entered: 01/08/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Martha Gale, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Magisterial District Judge William Kraut. [19-1001] (MG) [Entered: 01/08/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Guy A. Donatelli on behalf of Appellee(s) Dawson Richard Muth. [19-1001] (GAD) [Entered: 01/08/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey P. Lewis, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Leonard J. Rivera, Esquire and MacElree Harvey, Ltd.. [19-1001] (JPL) [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Suzanne McDonough, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Mark A. Murray (Director of Juvenile Detention Center). [19-1001] (SM) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Anthony Stocker Mina in District Court No. 2-18-cv-02455. (TMM) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less