This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:10:24 (UTC).

Anthony DeVaughn v. County of Los Angeles, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 Anthony DeVaughn filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55283

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

EARL JONES

RAYMOND RAMIREZ

OPTION-ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION

HILDA WEINTRAUB

Defendant / Appellees

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

MELVIN HILLARD, Inidiviual and official capacity

FIRST BANK & TRUST

PETER A. PARSONS, Badge # 250, Investigator Los Angeles District Attorney's Office

JEFFREY C. JONAS

IRENE JONES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DARREN J. MANNON, Investigator Riverside Co. District Attorney

ROBERT SCHULTZ, Individual and official capacity

JILL HARRISON

ANTHONY MCCONNELL, Individual and official capacity

JIM LARSH, Investigator Riverside Co. District Attorney

KAREN PEWITT, Badge# 188, Investigator Los Angeles District Attorneys Office

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY MARK DEVAUGHN

Los Angeles, CA 90016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John M. Porter Esquire

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane

San Bernardino, CA 92408-3508

Christopher D. Lockwood

Attorney at ARIAS & LOCKWOOD

1881 S. Business Center Drive, Suite 9A

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Tomas A. Guterres Esquire

Attorney at Collins, Collins, Muir & Stewart, LLP

1100 El Centro Street

South Pasadena, CA 91030

David Christopher Moore

Attorney at Collins, Collins, Muir & Stewart, LLP

1100 El Centro Street

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony Mark DeVaughn

2849 Crenshaw Boulevard, Apt. B-31

Los Angeles, CA 90016

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has granted appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Clerk shall update this courts docket to reflect that appellants is proceeding in forma pauperis for this appeal. Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis docketed in this court (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is denied as unnecessary. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11237927] (JPD) [Entered: 03/21/2019 02:44 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Anthony Mark DeVaughn motion for limited remand to address reconsideration. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/07/2019. [11293661] (QDL) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:34 PM]

#1

Docketing Letter

#3

(#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 03/19/2019 granting motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. [11235071] (QDL) [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:29 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Anthony Mark DeVaughn motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/05/2019. [11227199] (QDL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:18 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed Appellant Anthony Mark DeVaughn motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief for 45 days. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/07/2019. [11293664] (QDL) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:35 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed Appellant Anthony Mark DeVaughn motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief for 45 days. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/07/2019. [11293664] (QDL) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Appellant Anthony Mark DeVaughn motion for limited remand to address reconsideration. Deficiencies: None. Served on 05/07/2019. [11293661] (QDL) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • (#6) Attorney Jessica J. Mead in 19-55283 substituted by Attorney David Christopher Moore in 19-55283 [11245728] (QDL) [Entered: 03/28/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David Christopher Moore for Appellees County of Los Angeles, Peter A. Parsons and Karen Pewitt. Substitution for Attorney Jessica J. Mead, Esquire for Appellees County of Los Angeles, Jeffrey C. Jonas, Peter A. Parsons and Karen Pewitt. Date of service: 03/28/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11245706] [19-55283] (Moore, David) [Entered: 03/28/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has granted appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Clerk shall update this courts docket to reflect that appellants is proceeding in forma pauperis for this appeal. Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis docketed in this court (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is denied as unnecessary. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11237927] (JPD) [Entered: 03/21/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received copy of District Court order filed on 03/19/2019 granting motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. [11235071] (QDL) [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Appellant Anthony Mark DeVaughn motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 03/05/2019. [11227199] (QDL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Anthony Mark DeVaughn opening brief due 05/07/2019. Appellees County of Los Angeles, County of Riverside, First Bank & Trust, Jill Harrison, Melvin Hillard, Jeffrey C. Jonas, Irene Jones, Jim Larsh, Darren J. Mannon, Anthony McConnell, Peter A. Parsons, Karen Pewitt and Robert Schultz answering brief due 06/06/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11224528] (JPD) [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.