This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:06:07 (UTC).

Anthony Davide v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Anthony Davide filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12722

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY L. DAVIDE

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant / Appellees

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony L. Davide

9415 Sunset Dr #274

Miami, FL 33173

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Peter James Maskow

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

1 E Broward Blvd Ste 1400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

William Lee Grimsley

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

10407 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Nicholas Mark New II

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

10407 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32256

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Anthony L. Davide. [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:14 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Anthony L. Davide. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/17/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/12/2019 11:40 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 08/08/2019 as to Appellant Anthony L. Davide. [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:46 AM]

Open Document #2

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Anthony L. Davide. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:07 AM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and FRE [19-12722] (ECF: Peter Maskow) [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Peter James Maskow for Appellees Ditech Financial LLC, FRE and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12722] (ECF: Peter Maskow) [Entered: 08/13/2019 04:37 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter James Maskow for FRE and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. [19-12722] --[Edited 07/31/2019 to remove Ditech Financial, LLC by LA] (ECF: Peter Maskow) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William L. Grimsley for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation [19-12722] (ECF: William Grimsley) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:03 PM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Anthony L. Davide. [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:09 AM]

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

JQ Issued

Open Document #3

DC Order Appealed Document No. 98

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Anthony L. Davide. [Entered: 09/03/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and FRE [19-12722] (ECF: Peter Maskow) [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Anthony L. Davide and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. [Entered: 08/14/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Peter James Maskow for Appellees Ditech Financial LLC, FRE and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12722] (ECF: Peter Maskow) [Entered: 08/13/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Anthony L. Davide. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/17/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/12/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 08/08/2019 as to Appellant Anthony L. Davide. [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Anthony L. Davide. [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Anthony L. Davide. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter James Maskow for FRE and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. [19-12722] --[Edited 07/31/2019 to remove Ditech Financial, LLC by LA] (ECF: Peter Maskow) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William L. Grimsley for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation [19-12722] (ECF: William Grimsley) [Entered: 07/30/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Anthony L. Davide on 07/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/30/2019 as to Appellant Anthony L. Davide. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/13/2019 as to Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing LLC [Entered: 07/22/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.