Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 06:44:59 (UTC).

Anthony Caiby v. Cynthia Link, et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Anthony Caiby filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Cynthia Link. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1385

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SUPERINTENDENT CYNTHIA LINK

DEPT. SUPERINTENDENT GEORGE ONDREJKA

CAPTAIN OF SECURITY MICHAEL SPAGLONETTI

MAJOR OF THE GUARD TERRA

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY V. CAIBY

Collegeville, PA 19426

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony V. Caiby

Attorney at Phoenix SCI

1200 Mokychic Drive, P.O. Box 244

Collegeville, PA 19426

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Document filed by Appellant Anthony Caiby in Support of the Appeal. (JK) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:21 PM]

4 #2

attachment

4 #1

Send screening letter

#3

(#3) Document filed by Appellant Anthony Caiby in Support of the Appeal. (JK) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:54 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Letter

1 #3

Case Caption

1 #2

District Court Order

#1

Notice of Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Anthony V. Caiby. (JK) [Entered: 03/18/2021 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Anthony V. Caiby. (JK) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION filed by Appellant Anthony V. Caiby to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 03/29/2021. Certificate of Service dated 03/18/2021. Service made by ECF. (JK) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Document filed by Appellant Anthony Caiby in Support of the Appeal. (JK) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (ZM) [Entered: 03/12/2021 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Document filed by Appellant Anthony Caiby in Support of the Appeal. (JK) [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Anthony V. Caiby in District Court No. 5-18-cv-00132. (AMR) [Entered: 03/02/2021 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less