This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/03/2021 at 06:05:57 (UTC).

Anthony Bryant v. Comcast Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Anthony Bryant filed an Other - Communication lawsuit against Comcast Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2081

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Communication

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY G. BRYANT

Charleston, SC 29403

Defendant / Appellee

COMCAST CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony G. Bryant

2123 Courtland Avenue

Charleston, SC 29403

 

Court Documents

#2

3 #1

Fee notice

3 #2

IFP application

#4

#5

#8

(#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Anthony G. Bryant. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:29 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [9] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Bryant. [1001042099] [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:40 PM]

#11

(#11) UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03077-MBS-MGB. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001061775]. Mailed to: Bryant. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 11/19/2021 09:14 AM]

12 #1

Notice

12 #2

Judgment order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03077-MBS-MGB. Entered on Docket Date: 11/19/2021. [1001061808] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Bryant. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 11/19/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03077-MBS-MGB. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001061775]. Mailed to: Bryant. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 11/19/2021 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [9] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Bryant. [1001042099] [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#9) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Anthony G. Bryant. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Anthony G. Bryant. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#6) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03077-MBS-MGB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/06/2021 07:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/18/2021. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Bryant. Informal Opening Brief due 10/28/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Anthony G. Bryant - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/03/2021 Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03077-MBS-MGB. Mailed to: Bryant. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03077-MBS-MGB. Case manager: AWalker. [21-2081] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony G. Bryant