This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/03/2021 at 06:17:11 (UTC).

Anthony Bryant v. Alphabet Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Anthony Bryant filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alphabet Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2083

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANTHONY G. BRYANT

Charleston, SC 29403

Defendant / Appellees

ALPHABET INC.

GOOGLE CORPORATION

YOUTUBE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anthony G. Bryant

2123 Courtland Avenue

Charleston, SC 29403

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Fee Notice

#2

IFP application

#3

#4

#6

(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Anthony G. Bryant. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:32 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [7] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Bryant. [1001042123] [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:49 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis [7] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Bryant. [1001042123] [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) IFP-APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24)(court access only) by Anthony G. Bryant. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Anthony G. Bryant. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03034-MBS-MGB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/07/2021 06:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 10/18/2021. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Bryant. Informal Opening Brief due 10/28/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Anthony G. Bryant - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/03/2021 Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03034-MBS-MGB. Mailed to: Bryant. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:21-cv-03034-MBS-MGB. Case manager: AWalker. [21-2083] AW [Entered: 10/04/2021 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUTUBE is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Alphabet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony G. Bryant