This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2019 at 06:01:56 (UTC).

Anne Cain, et al v. Twitter, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Anne Cain filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Twitter, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16265

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ANNE CAMERON CAIN, individually and as representative of the Estate of Alexander Pinczowski

BEATRIZ GONZALEZ, individually and as the Representative of the Estate of Nohemi Gonzalez

JOSE HERNANDEZ

REYNALDO GONZALEZ

PAUL GONZALEZ

REY GONZALEZ

Defendant / Appellee

TWITTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert J. Tolchin Esquire

Attorney at The Berkman Law Office, LLC

111 Livingston Street, Suite 1928

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Meir Katz

Attorney at Berkman Law Office

P.O. Box 65335

Baltimore, MD 21209

Keith L. Altman

Attorney at Excolo Law

26700 Lasher Road, Suite 401

Southfield, MI 48033

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mark Donnell Flanagan

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

950 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Seth P. Waxman

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Ari Holtzblatt

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Patrick Joseph Carome

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LK): Appellees motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) for a stay of appellate proceedings is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed until issuance of the mandates in Taamneh v. Twitter, Inc., No. 18-17192, Clayborn v. Twitter, Inc., No. 19-15043, and Gonzalez v. Google, LLC, No. 18-16700. Appellee shall file a status report on November 12, 2019 and every 90 days thereafter while Taamneh v. Twitter, Inc., Clayborn v. Twitter, Inc., and Gonzalez v. Google, LLC, are pending. Appellant shall notify the court by filing a status report within 7 days of the issuance of the mandate in Taamneh v. Twitter, Inc., Clayborn v. Twitter, Inc., or Gonzalez v. Google, LLC. Failure to file a status report may terminate the stay of appellate proceedings. The briefing schedule will be reset in a future order. [11394926] (JBS) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:24 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Twitter, Inc. Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 07/31/2019. [11382422] [19-16265] (Carome, Patrick) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:44 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Anne Cameron Cain, Beatriz Gonzalez, Paul Gonzalez, Rey Gonzalez and Jose Hernandez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/04/2019. [11354531] [19-16265] (Katz, Meir) [Entered: 07/04/2019 10:16 AM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Reynaldo Gonzalez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/03/2019. [11353551] [19-16265] (Altman, Keith) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:06 AM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LK): Appellees motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 8 ]) for a stay of appellate proceedings is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed until issuance of the mandates in Taamneh v. Twitter, Inc., No. 18-17192, Clayborn v. Twitter, Inc., No. 19-15043, and Gonzalez v. Google, LLC, No. 18-16700. Appellee shall file a status report on November 12, 2019 and every 90 days thereafter while Taamneh v. Twitter, Inc., Clayborn v. Twitter, Inc., and Gonzalez v. Google, LLC, are pending. Appellant shall notify the court by filing a status report within 7 days of the issuance of the mandate in Taamneh v. Twitter, Inc., Clayborn v. Twitter, Inc., or Gonzalez v. Google, LLC. Failure to file a status report may terminate the stay of appellate proceedings. The briefing schedule will be reset in a future order. [11394926] (JBS) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee Twitter, Inc. Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 07/31/2019. [11382422] [19-16265] (Carome, Patrick) [Entered: 07/31/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2019
  • (#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11354544][19-16265] (AD) [Entered: 07/04/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Anne Cameron Cain, Beatriz Gonzalez, Paul Gonzalez, Rey Gonzalez and Jose Hernandez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/04/2019. [11354531] [19-16265] (Katz, Meir) [Entered: 07/04/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/03/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11353734][19-16265] (AD) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Reynaldo Gonzalez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/03/2019. [11353551] [19-16265] (Altman, Keith) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#3) Added attorney Meir Katz for Anne Cameron Cain Jose Hernandez Rey Gonzalez Beatriz Gonzalez Paul Gonzalez. [11346403] (RL) [Entered: 06/27/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Meir Katz for Appellants Anne Cameron Cain, Beatriz Gonzalez, Paul Gonzalez, Jose Hernandez and Rey Gonzalez. Date of service: 06/27/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11346333] [19-16265] (Katz, Meir) [Entered: 06/27/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/03/2019. Appellants Anne Cameron Cain, Beatriz Gonzalez, Paul Gonzalez, Rey Gonzalez, Reynaldo Gonzalez and Jose Hernandez opening brief due 08/26/2019. Appellee Twitter, Inc. answering brief due 09/23/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11344746] (JBS) [Entered: 06/26/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less