This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/03/2022 at 06:11:50 (UTC).

Anne Block v. Washington State Bar Associati, et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Anne Block filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Washington State Bar Associati. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35922

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANNE BLOCK, Esquire, an individual

Monroe, WA 98272

Defendant / Appellees

WASHINGTON STATE BAR ASSOCIATION

LINDA EIDE, individually and in her capacity as an employee of defendant Washington State Bar Association

MARK PLIVILECH, in his individual capacity and in his marital community with wife and/or domestic partner defendant Lin O'Dell

Nine Mile Falls, WA 99026

JENNIFER DREMOUSIS, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

JULIE SHANKLAND, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

KATHRYN BERGER, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

ALLISON SATO

STEPHANIE L. BLOOMFIELD, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

MARCIA LYNN DAMEROW FISCHER, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

MARC SILVERMAN, individually and in his capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

STEPHANIA CAMP DENTON, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

MICHELE NINA CARNEY, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

SARA ANDEEN

TODD R. STARTZEL, individually and in his capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

S NIA RENEI COTTRELL, individually and in her capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

MICHAEL JON MYERS, individually and in his capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

WILLIAM EARL DAVIS

KEITH MASON BLACK, individually and in his capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

KEVIN BANK, individually and in his capacity as defendant Washington State Bar Association

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Anne Block Esquire

15 3/4 W Main Street, No. 204

Monroe, WA 98272

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David W. Silke

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Shannon Wodnik

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 2100

Seattle, WA 98104

Mark Plivilech

15010 W Four Mound Rd.

Nine Mile Falls, WA 99026

Other Attorneys

Sean Donald Reay

Attorney at Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney

3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504

Everett, WA 98201

Geoffrey Martin Grindeland

Attorney at Seamark Law Group PLLC

400 Winslow Way E, Suite 230

Bainbridge Island, WA 98110

Shannon Mary Ragonesi

Attorney at Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc., PS

801 2Nd Avenue, Suite 1210

Seattle, WA 98104

Thomas P. Miller

Attorney at Christie Law Group, PLLC

2100 Westlake Avenue, N, Suite 206

Seattle, WA 98109

Michael R. Kenyon Esquire

Attorney at KENYON DISEND, PLLC

11 Front Street South

Issaquah, WA 98027

Brian C. Dale Esquire

Attorney at Deno, Millikan, Dale, Decker & Petersen

3411 Colby Avenue

Everett, WA 98201-4709

William Scheidler

1515 Lindstrom Place E

Port Orchard, WA 98366

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Fee Due OSC

#2

Main Document

2 #3

Additional Document

#6

(#6) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12298526] (RR) [Entered: 11/26/2021 11:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12298526] (RR) [Entered: 11/26/2021 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 11/24/2021. [12298391] (RT) [Entered: 11/26/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Joseph Burke Genster substituted by Attorneys Sean Donald Reay. [12279763] (RL) [Entered: 11/05/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sean D. Reay (Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney - Civil Division; 3000 Rockefeller Avenue, M/S 504, Everett, WA 98201) for Appellees Sara DiVittorio, Seth Aaron Fine, G. Geoffrey Gibbs, Brian Lewis, John Lovick, John Pennington, Sean Donald Reay, Mark K Roe and Snohomish County. Substitution for Attorney Joseph Burke Genster, Esquire for Appellees Sara DiVittorio, Seth Aaron Fine, G. Geoffrey Gibbs, Brian Lewis, John Lovick, Lin O'Dell, John Pennington, Sean Donald Reay, Mark K Roe and Snohomish County. Date of service: 11/05/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12279744] [21-35922] (Reay, Sean) [Entered: 11/05/2021 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12278661] (CKP) [Entered: 11/04/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Anne Block opening brief due 01/05/2022. Appellees Sara Andeen, Kevin Bank, Lori Batiot, Joe Beavers, Kathryn Berger, Keith Mason Black, Stephanie L. Bloomfield, Stephania Camp Denton, Michele Nina Carney, Andrew Carrington, City of Duvall, City of Goldbar, Cary Coblantz, S Nia Renei Cottrell, Marcia Lynn Damerow Fischer, William Earl Davis, Sara DiVittorio, John Doe, Jennifer Dremousis, Linda Eide, Douglas J. Ende, Ronald Fejfar, Seth Aaron Fine, G. Geoffrey Gibbs, Sean Gillebo, Michael R. Kenyon, Kenyon Disend, Margaret King, King County, Brian Lewis, Linda Loen, John Lovick, Kali Matuska, William G. McGillin, Sherry Mehr, Michael Jon Myers, Joseph Nappi Jr., Lin O'Dell, Crystal Hill Pennington, John Pennington, Mark Plivilech, Port of Seattle, Sean Donald Reay, Mark K Roe, Allison Sato, Ronald T. Schaps, William Scheidler, Nadine Scott, Julie Shankland, Marc Silverman, Sky Valley Media Group LLC, Snohomish County, Ann Marie Soto, Todd R. Startzel, Sandra Sullivan, Brandia Taamu, Julie Tanga, James Tuttle and Washington State Bar Association answering brief due 02/07/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12278463] (RT) [Entered: 11/04/2021 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Washington State Bar Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey M Grindeland(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas P Miller