Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2020 at 06:31:25 (UTC).

Ann McLaurin, et al v. The Terminix International Co., et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Ann McLaurin filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against The Terminix International Co . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-12904

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

LYNNE FITZGERALD

ANN MCLAURIN

Defendant / Appellants

THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, LP

TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adam Matthew Milam

Attorney at Milam & Milam, LLC

20252 Hwy 181 Ste C

Fairhope, AL 36532

Thomas F. Campbell

Attorney at Campbell Law, PC

5336 Stadium Trace Pkwy Ste 206

Birmingham, AL 35244

James Christopher Cochran

Attorney at Campbell Law, PC

5336 Stadium Trace Pkwy Ste 206

Birmingham, AL 35244

Brandon K. Falls

Attorney at Campbell Law, PC

5336 Stadium Trace Pkwy Ste 206

Birmingham, AL 35244

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael L. Bell

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Haley A. Cox

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Mark Christian King

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

Open Document #7

Appendix Volume 7

Open Document #6

Appendix Volume 6

Open Document #5

Appendix Volume 5

Open Document #4

Appendix Volume 4

Open Document #3

Appendix Volume 3

Open Document #2

Appendix Volume 2

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix Filed

Open Document

Appellant-Cross Appellee's Brief filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Terminix International, Inc. and Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP. [20-12904] (ECF: Mark King) [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:17 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Christopher Cochran for Appellees-Cross Appellants, Ann McLaurin and Lynne Fitzgerald [20-12904] (ECF: James Cochran) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:32 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Matthew Milam for Lynne Fitzgerald and Ann McLaurin. [20-12904] (ECF: Adam Milam) [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:34 AM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Adam Matthew Milam for Appellees Lynne Fitzgerald and Ann McLaurin. [20-12904] (ECF: Adam Milam) [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:01 PM]

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

DC #30 Judgment

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

DC #29 Order

Open Document #2

DC #30 Judgment

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP and Appellant-Cross Appellee Terminix International, Inc.. 7 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 09/23/2020 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [7 VOLUMES] by Appellant-Cross Appellee Terminix International, Inc. and Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP. [20-12904] (ECF: Mark King) [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP. [Entered: 09/15/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant-Cross Appellee's Brief filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Terminix International, Inc. and Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP. [20-12904] (ECF: Mark King) [Entered: 09/11/2020 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Christopher Cochran for Appellees-Cross Appellants, Ann McLaurin and Lynne Fitzgerald [20-12904] (ECF: James Cochran) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brandon K. Falls for Ann McLaurin and Lynne Fitzgerald [20-12904] (ECF: Brandon Falls) [Entered: 08/31/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Thomas F. Campbell for Ann McLaurin and Lynne Fitzgerald. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 08/28/2020 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas F. Campbell for Appellees-Cross Appellants Lynne Fitzgerald and Ann McLaurin. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12904] (ECF: Thomas Campbell) [Entered: 08/27/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [20-12904, 20-12975] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Mark Christian King for Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP and Appellant-Cross Appellee Terminix International, Inc.. No hearings. [Entered: 08/19/2020 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Haley A. Cox for Appellant-Cross Appellee Terminix International, Inc. and Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP. [20-12904] (ECF: Haley Cox) [Entered: 08/18/2020 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Haley A. Cox for Terminix International, Inc. and The Terminix International Company, LP. [20-12904] (ECF: Haley Cox) [Entered: 08/18/2020 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael L. Bell for Terminix International, Inc. and The Terminix International Company, LP. [20-12904] (ECF: Michael Bell) [Entered: 08/18/2020 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by M. Christian King for Terminix International Company, L.P., and Terminix International, Inc. [20-12904] (ECF: Mark King) [Entered: 08/18/2020 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M. Christian King for Terminix International Company, L.P., and Terminix International, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-12904] (ECF: Mark King) [Entered: 08/18/2020 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Matthew Milam for Lynne Fitzgerald and Ann McLaurin. [20-12904] (ECF: Adam Milam) [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by Adam Matthew Milam for Ann McLaurin and Lynne Fitzgerald. Appearance of counsel form has not been filed. Counsel who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and file an appearance of counsel form. Appearance of Counsel Form are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. Counsel must file an Appearance of Counsel form within 3 days. [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Adam Matthew Milam for Appellees Lynne Fitzgerald and Ann McLaurin. [20-12904] (ECF: Adam Milam) [Entered: 08/12/2020 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellees-Cross Appellants Lynne Fitzgerald and Ann McLaurin on 08/07/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 08/13/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Terminix International, Inc. and The Terminix International Company, LP on 08/04/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/14/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/18/2020 as to Appellant The Terminix International Company, LP. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/01/2020 as to Appellee Ann McLaurin [Entered: 08/07/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haley Andrews Cox(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M Christian King