This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:31:54 (UTC).

Angela Craig, et al v. Steve Simon, et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Angela Craig filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Steve Simon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3126

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

Steve Simon, in his official capacity as Minnesota Secretary of State

Plaintiff / Appellees

Angela Craig

Jenny Winslow Davies

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant

Tyler Kistner

Not Yet Classified

U.S. House of Representatives

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Nathan J. Hartshorn

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 1400, 445 Minnesota Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101-2127

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

David Joseph Zoll

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL

Suite 2200, 100 Washington Avenue, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55401-0000

Laura Hill

Attorney at PERKINS & COIE

40Th Floor, 1201 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-0000

Marc E. Elias

Attorney at PERKINS & COIE

Suite 800, 700 13Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Rachel Kitze Collins

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL

Suite 2200, 100 Washington Avenue, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55401-0000

Nitika Arora

Attorney at PERKINS & COIE

40Th Floor, 1201 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-0000

Holly Marie Simpkins

Attorney at PERKINS & COIE

40Th Floor, 1201 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-0000

Charles Nathan Nauen

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE & GRINDAL

Suite 2200, 100 Washington Avenue, S.

Minneapolis, MN 55401-0000

Joel J. Ramirez

Attorney at PERKINS & COIE

Suite 800, 700 13Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Kevin J. Hamilton

Attorney at PERKINS & COIE

40Th Floor, 1201 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101-0000

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jeffrey Kyle Holth

Attorney at JACOBSON & MAGNUSON

Suite 940, 180 E. Fifth Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101

Rondell Reid LeBeau II

Attorney at JACOBSON & MAGNUSON

335 Atrium Office Building, 1295 Bandana Boulevard

Saint Paul, MN 55108

Andrew Michael Grossman

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER

Suite 1100, 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Benjamin Nashoba Pachito

Attorney at JACOBSON & MAGNUSON

Suite 940, 180 E. Fifth Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

William Ernest Havemann

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515-0000

Michael R. Dreeben

Attorney at GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY

600 New Jersey Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Evan Noller Bianchi

Attorney at SELENDY & GAY

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Todd Barry Tatelman

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515-0000

Douglas Neal Letter

Attorney at U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515-0000

Caitlin Joan Halligan

Attorney at SELENDY & GAY

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED. [4984249] [20-3126] (LMT) [Entered: 12/11/2020 10:14 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of 12/01/2020 Notice/Order pretrial sched. conference. [4980970] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:58 AM]

Open Document

LETTER from Interested Party Ms. Paula Mirare Overby regarding My motion to intervene was substantially delayed by clerical process. Denying the motion disregards substantive arguments defined by the United States Supreme Court. This is an exceptional case. There are circumstances which are previously unprecedented.. w/service 11/22/2020 [4978137] [20-3126] (PMO) [Entered: 11/22/2020 10:37 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT FILED - The order of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion JAMES B. LOKEN, STEVEN M. COLLOTON and DUANE BENTON Hrg Nov 2020 [4977677] [20-3126] (NDW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 08:48 AM]

Open Document #3

Opinion

Open Document #2

Letter To Publishing

Open Document #3

Envelope

Open Document #2

Cover Letter

Open Document #1

Motion to Intervene

Open Document #5

Exhibit D

Open Document #4

Exhibit C

Open Document #3

Exhibit B

Open Document #2

Exhibit A

Open Document #1

Emergency Motion for Administrative Stay, Stay Pending Appeal, and Expedited Con

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Andrew M. Grossman for Appellant Tyler Kistner w/service 10/13/2020 [4964933] [20-3126] (AMG) [Entered: 10/13/2020 01:56 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/23/2020. Appendix due 12/02/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Tyler Kistner due 12/02/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4964836] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:50 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Order granting motion to intervene and motion for preliminary injunction 10/9/20. NOTE: THIS IS AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. [4964827] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:42 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4964804] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:13 AM]

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [4984249] [20-3126] (LMT) [Entered: 12/11/2020 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of 12/01/2020 Notice/Order pretrial sched. conference. [4980970] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 12/02/2020 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Interested Party Ms. Paula Mirare Overby regarding My motion to intervene was substantially delayed by clerical process. Denying the motion disregards substantive arguments defined by the United States Supreme Court. This is an exceptional case. There are circumstances which are previously unprecedented.. w/service 11/22/2020 [4978137] [20-3126] (PMO) [Entered: 11/22/2020 10:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - The order of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion JAMES B. LOKEN, STEVEN M. COLLOTON and DUANE BENTON Hrg Nov 2020 [4977677] [20-3126] (NDW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: James B. Loken, Steven M. Colloton and Duane Benton (PUBLISHED); Paula Overby's motion for leave to intervene on appeal is denied as untimely. [ # 4974589-2 ] [4977662] [20-3126] (NDW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 08:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED/INITIAL certificate of service for brief Reply brief, Doc No. [ # 4974380-2 ], Paper Brief, Doc No. [ # 4974949-2 ], filed by Appellant Tyler Kistner [4975621] [20-3126] (AMG) [Entered: 11/13/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketARGUED & SUBMITTED in Via Videoconference to Judges James B. Loken, Steven M. Colloton (presiding), Duane Benton on 11/13/2020. Mr. Richard Bryan Raile for Appellant Tyler Kistner; Mr. Marc E. Elias for Appellees Angela Craig and Jenny Winslow Davies. Rebuttal by Mr. Richard Bryan Raile for Tyler Kistner RECORDED. # Click Here To Listen to Oral Argument [4975385] [20-3126] (JMM) [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPaper copies Amicus Brief, [ # 4973963-2 ] filed by U.S. House of Representatives. 10 paper copies received. [4974959] [20-3126] (BNW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPaper copies Appellees brief, [ # 4973932-2 ] filed by Angela Craig and Jenny Winslow Davies. 10 paper copies received w/Addendum attached. [4974958] [20-3126] (BNW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaper copies Reply brief, [ # 4974380-2 ] filed by Tyler Kistner. 10 paper copies received. Paper brief deficiency due 11/17/2020. [4974949] [20-3126] (BNW) [Entered: 11/12/2020 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Rachel A. Kitze Collins for Appellees Angela Craig and Jenny Winslow Davies w/service 10/13/2020 [4965125] [20-3126] (RK) [Entered: 10/13/2020 07:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by David J. Zoll for Appellees Angela Craig and Jenny Winslow Davies w/service 10/13/2020 [4965124] [20-3126] (DJZ) [Entered: 10/13/2020 07:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Charles N. Nauen for Appellees Angela Craig and Jenny Winslow Davies w/service 10/13/2020 [4965123] [20-3126] (CNN) [Entered: 10/13/2020 07:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Nathan J. Hartshorn for Not Party Steve Simon w/service 10/13/2020 [4965098] [20-3126] Counsel contacted regarding not party status of Simon. Counsel added for information only.--[Edited 10/14/2020 by LMT] (NJH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of text-only court order of 10/13/2020 re motion to stay prelim. injunction, [4965087] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION for administrative stay, stay pending appeal, for expedited consideration filed by Mr. Andrew Michael Grossman for Appellant Tyler Kistner and Mr. R. Reid LeBeau, II for Appellant Tyler Kistner w/service 10/13/2020. [4965000] [20-3126]--[Edited 10/13/2020 by LMT] (AMG) [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Andrew M. Grossman for Appellant Tyler Kistner w/service 10/13/2020 [4964933] [20-3126] (AMG) [Entered: 10/13/2020 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/23/2020. Appendix due 12/02/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Tyler Kistner due 12/02/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4964836] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Order granting motion to intervene and motion for preliminary injunction 10/9/20. NOTE: THIS IS AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. [4964827] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4964804] [20-3126] (MMH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Noller Bianchi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Ernest Havemann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caitlin Halligan