This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/07/2020 at 07:20:16 (UTC).

Angel Peterson v. Anthony Steward, et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Angel Peterson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Anthony Steward. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1421

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

OFFICE OF COMMUNITY CORRECTIONS

RASHEED ANSARI

HEIDI E. WASHINGTON

ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICE

TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC.

ANTHONY STEWARD

ANTHONY STEWART

ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANGEL PETERSON

Ypsilanti, MI 48197

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Josephine A. DeLorenzo

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

38505 Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Rhonda Stowers

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

111 E. Court Street, Suite 1B Plaza One Financial Center

Flint, MI 48502

Bradford S. Moyer

Attorney at Plunkett Cooney

333 Bridge Street, N.W., Suite 530 Bridgewater Place

Grand Rapids, MI 49504

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Angel Peterson

Attorney at Huron Valley Complex - Women

3201 Bemis Road

Ypsilanti, MI 48197

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Appellant RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to proceed ifp, [ # 10 ]; previously filed by filed by Ms. Angel Peterson. Response from Attorney Mr. Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho for Appellees Office of Community Corrections and Heidi E. Washington. Certificate of Service:06/29/2020. Received after ruling on motion. [20-1421] (JYH) [Entered: 06/29/2020 08:51 AM]

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Appellant MOTION filed by Ms. Angel Peterson to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 06/05/2020. (AEG) [Entered: 06/10/2020 03:32 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Office of Community Corrections and Heidi E. Washington by Joseph Y. Ho. Certificate of Service: 06/08/2020. [20-1421] (JYH) [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:42 PM]

#7

(#7) LETTER SENT to all parties regarding the corrected case caption. (JE) [Entered: 06/05/2020 11:22 AM]

#6

(#6) LETTER SENT to Ms. Angel Peterson regarding the request for information about the appellate filing fee. (JE) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:39 PM]

#5

(#5) CORRESPONDENCE: Request for information regarding the appellate filing fee by Ms. Angel Peterson. (JE) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:38 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Trinity Services Group, Inc. by Bradford S. Moyer. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2020. [20-1421] (BSM) [Entered: 05/14/2020 01:43 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Rasheed Ansari and Aramark Correctional Service by Josephine A. DeLorenzo. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2020. [20-1421] (JAD) [Entered: 05/14/2020 12:22 PM]

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Angel Peterson. Transcript needed: n. (JE) [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:24 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Appellant RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to proceed ifp, [ # 10 ]; previously filed by filed by Ms. Angel Peterson. Response from Attorney Mr. Joseph Yung-Kuang Ho for Appellees Office of Community Corrections and Heidi E. Washington. Certificate of Service:06/29/2020. Received after ruling on motion. [20-1421] (JYH) [Entered: 06/29/2020 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Ms. Angel Peterson Certificate of Service: 06/05/2020. (AEG) [Entered: 06/10/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Appellant MOTION filed by Ms. Angel Peterson to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 06/05/2020. (AEG) [Entered: 06/10/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#9) The case manager for this case is now: Amy E. Gigliotti (LAJ) [Entered: 06/09/2020 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Office of Community Corrections and Heidi E. Washington by Joseph Y. Ho. Certificate of Service: 06/08/2020. [20-1421] (JYH) [Entered: 06/08/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER SENT to all parties regarding the corrected case caption. (JE) [Entered: 06/05/2020 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER SENT to Ms. Angel Peterson regarding the request for information about the appellate filing fee. (JE) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORRESPONDENCE: Request for information regarding the appellate filing fee by Ms. Angel Peterson. (JE) [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Trinity Services Group, Inc. by Bradford S. Moyer. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2020. [20-1421] (BSM) [Entered: 05/14/2020 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Rasheed Ansari and Aramark Correctional Service by Josephine A. DeLorenzo. Certificate of Service: 05/14/2020. [20-1421] (JAD) [Entered: 05/14/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Earl (JE) [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Angel Peterson. Transcript needed: n. (JE) [Entered: 05/08/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aramark Correctional Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. is a litigant