This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:05:04 (UTC).

Angel Osornio v. Beverly Tower Wilshire Advance

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Angel Osornio filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Beverly Tower Wilshire Advance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55016

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

BEVERLY TOWER WILSHIRE ADVANCE IMAGING CENTER

Plaintiff / Appellant

ANGEL OSORNIO

Flagstaff, AZ 86003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Angel Osornio

P.O. Box 31326

Flagstaff, AZ 86003

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Angel Osornio response to 1/18/19 order. Served on 02/11/2019. [11196998] (CW) [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:59 PM]

3 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Angel Osornio motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 12/17/2018. [11142202] (HC) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:58 PM]

1 #2

Pro Se Case Information Packet

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Angel Osornio response to 1/18/19 order. Served on 02/11/2019. [11196998] (CW) [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and is frivolous and has denied appellants motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal or statement that the appeal should go forward. [11158991] (CKP) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed Appellant Angel Osornio motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 12/17/2018. [11142202] (HC) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Angel Osornio opening brief due 03/04/2019. (No appearance for appellee-no answering brief deadline set) [11142187] (HC) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less