This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2020 at 06:05:54 (UTC).

Angel Oliva v. USA

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Angel Oliva filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-10440

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

ANGEL NOEL OLIVA

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Philip Robert Horowitz

Attorney at Law Office of Philip R. Horowitz, Esq.

9130 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1910

Miami, FL 33156-7858

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Laura Thomas Rivero

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

DC Order DE #37

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

USDC Order or Motion on COA

Open Document #2

HAB-3 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(Amended)***MOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Angel Noel Oliva. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9041222-1] [20-10440]--[Edited 03/25/2020 by DEO] (ECF: Philip Horowitz) [Entered: 03/23/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for certificate of appealability filed by Angel Noel Oliva. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9040430-1] [20-10440] (ECF: Philip Horowitz) [Entered: 03/21/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSDC order denying COA as to Appellant Angel Noel Oliva was filed on 01/31/2020. Docket Entry 37. [Entered: 03/06/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Philip Robert Horowitz for Appellant Angel Noel Oliva. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 02/19/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for Appellee [20-10440] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 02/18/2020 05:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Laura Thomas Rivero for USA Ariana Fajardo Orshan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10440] (ECF: Laura Rivero) [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Philip Robert Horowitz for Appellant Angel Noel Oliva. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-10440] (ECF: Philip Horowitz) [Entered: 02/17/2020 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCJA appointment issued by this court to Attorney Philip Robert Horowitz for Appellant Angel Noel Oliva. [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [20-10440] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Angel Noel Oliva on 02/03/2020. Fee Status: IFP Granted. [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Thomas Rivero

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily M. Smachetti