This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2019 at 06:06:14 (UTC).

Andrew Walker v. John Henderson, et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Andrew Walker filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against John Henderson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1520

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Bland, APN, CCS

John Doe, Employee, Administration, Classification Committee, Wrightsville Unit, ADC

Melanie Jones, Doctor, CCS (originally named as M. Jones)

Ray Hobbs, Former Director, ADC

Jackson, Nurse, CCS

Correctional Care Solutions, also known as CCS, Inc.

D. Payne, Employee, ADC

B. Cromwell, Contract Employee, CCS

Arkansas Department of Correction

Esaw, Health Administration, CCS

Griswold, CCS

Wendy Kelley, Director, ADC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Andrew S. Walker

Malvern, AR 72104-1630

Defendant / Appellees

Stephen M. Cockrell, Sergeant, Wrightsville Unit, ADC (originally named as S. Cockrell)

John L. Henderson, Sergeant, Wrightsville Unit, ADC (originally named as J. Henderson)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Andrew S. Walker

Attorney at ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

P.O. Box 1630

Malvern, AR 72104-1630

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Renae Ford Hudson

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

200 Catlett-Prien Building, 323 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Recommended Disposition dated 1/14/2019, Order and Judgment both dated 2/20/2019, and Order dated 3/7/2019. [4766433] [19-1520] (CMH) [Entered: 03/14/2019 07:50 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Andrew S. Walker due 04/23/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766436] [19-1520] (CMH) [Entered: 03/14/2019 07:52 AM]

Open Document

Prisoner case docketed. [4766405] [19-1520]--[Edited 03/14/2019 by CMH] (CMH) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:06 PM]

Open Document #1

Walker Brief

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Andrew S. Walker. w/service by USCA8 05/01/2019 , Length: 6 pages Brief of Stephen M. Cockrell and John L. Henderson due on 05/31/2019 [4783273] [19-1520] (CMD) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Andrew S. Walker due 04/23/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766436] [19-1520] (CMH) [Entered: 03/14/2019 07:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Recommended Disposition dated 1/14/2019, Order and Judgment both dated 2/20/2019, and Order dated 3/7/2019. [4766433] [19-1520] (CMH) [Entered: 03/14/2019 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4766405] [19-1520]--[Edited 03/14/2019 by CMH] (CMH) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.