This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/28/2021 at 06:15:40 (UTC).

Andrew Stoia, et al v. Betty Yee, et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Andrew Stoia filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Betty Yee. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16597

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ANDREW STOIA

MARY DELONGFIELD

Defendant / Appellees

BETTY YEE, in her Official Capacity as State Controller of the State of California

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION LOCAL 2015, a Labor Organization

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mariah Gondeiro Esquire

Attorney at Advocates For Faith and Freedom

25026 Las Brisas Road

Murrieta, CA 92562

Shella Sadovnik

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Robert H. Tyler Esquire

Attorney at Tyler & Bursch, LLP

25026 Las Brisas Road

Murrieta, CA 92562

Shella Sadovnik Alcabes

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Anthony R. Hakl

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Ryan Andrew Hanley

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Scott A. Kronland

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Stacey Leyton

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet for Attorneys

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Andrew Stoia and Mary DeLongfield Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/06/2021. [12250127] [21-16597] (Gondeiro, Mariah) [Entered: 10/06/2021 07:29 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/02/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12261984] (VS) [Entered: 10/19/2021 03:38 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/02/2021, 2:00 p.m.,PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12282401] (VS) [Entered: 11/09/2021 10:10 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/02/2021, 2:00 p.m.,PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12282401] (VS) [Entered: 11/09/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/02/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12261984] (VS) [Entered: 10/19/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/06/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12250194]. [21-16597] (AD) [Entered: 10/07/2021 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Andrew Stoia and Mary DeLongfield Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/06/2021. [12250127] [21-16597] (Gondeiro, Mariah) [Entered: 10/06/2021 07:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Mary DeLongfield and Andrew Stoia Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/06/2021. Transcript ordered by 10/27/2021. Transcript due 11/26/2021. Appellants Mary DeLongfield and Andrew Stoia opening brief due 01/05/2022. Appellees Xavier Becerra, Service Employees International Union Local 2015 and Betty Yee answering brief due 02/04/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12242410] (JPD) [Entered: 09/29/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Richard Hakl, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Kronland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey Monica Leyton