This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 06:08:46 (UTC).

Andrew Pieters v. USA

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Andrew Pieters filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-14705

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner / Appellant

ANDREW PIETERS

Pensacola, FL 32516

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Roberta Josephina Bodnar

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - FLM

35 Se 1St Ave Ste 300

Ocala, FL 34471

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Andrew Pieters

Attorney at FPC Pensacola - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 3949

Pensacola, FL 32516

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Andrew Pieters. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8974824-1] [Entered: 01/07/2020 11:30 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Roberta Josephina Bodnar for United States of America. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14705] (ECF: Roberta Bodnar) [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:23 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Roberta Josephina Bodnar for United States of America [19-14705] (ECF: Roberta Bodnar) [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Andrew Pieters. [Entered: 12/19/2019 07:59 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Andrew Pieters. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/12/2019 08:07 AM]

Open Document #2

USDC Order or Motion on IFP

Open Document #1

HAB-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Andrew Pieters was filed on 11/26/2019. Docket Entry 25. [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:56 AM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Andrew Pieters was filed on 11/05/2019. Docket Entry 22. [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:55 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #22

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability construed from the notice of appeal filed by Appellant Andrew Pieters. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8974824-1] [Entered: 01/07/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Roberta Josephina Bodnar for United States of America. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14705] (ECF: Roberta Bodnar) [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Roberta Josephina Bodnar for United States of America [19-14705] (ECF: Roberta Bodnar) [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida for USA. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/27/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Andrew Pieters. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8968631-1] [Entered: 12/30/2019 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Andrew Pieters. [Entered: 12/19/2019 07:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Andrew Pieters. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 12/12/2019 08:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Andrew Pieters was filed on 12/02/2019. Docket Entry 27. [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Andrew Pieters was filed on 11/26/2019. Docket Entry 25. [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Andrew Pieters was filed on 11/05/2019. Docket Entry 22. [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Andrew Pieters on 11/26/2019 11/26/2019. Fee Status: IFP Pending. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less