This case was last updated from PACER on 04/11/2020 at 06:09:32 (UTC).

Andrew High v. Murphy-Brown, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Andrew High filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Murphy-Brown, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1150

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALBERTA BATTS

SETH WALSTON, JR.

Plaintiff / Appellees

HATTIE TUCKER

RAQUAN SCARBOROUGH

LILLIE WAYMON

ANDREW LEE BROWN

RANDY ALLEN DAVIS, Executor of the Estate of Jennie Stancil Davis

ELAINE CARLTON

LOIS STEWART BANKS

HELEN C. DOBSON

BRENDA ATKINSON

COLLINS LOPEZ

ANNIE HARPER

KANDACE BLANKS

KENTREL DAVIS

CELESTINE BROWN SMITH

MAYA JUDGE

ELAINE FAISON HUNT

FOSTINA JONES

HERMETTA JUDGE

527 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

John S. Hughes Esq.

Attorney at WALLACE & GRAHAM, PA

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144-0000

Mona Lisa Wallace

Attorney at WALLACE & GRAHAM, PA

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144-0000

Other Attorneys

Mark E. Anderson Esq.

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

P. O. Box 27507

Raleigh, NC 27611-7507

Stuart Alan Raphael

Attorney at HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH, LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Samuel G. Thompson Jr.

Attorney at YATES, MCLAMB & WEYHER, LLP

P. O. Box 2889

Raleigh, NC 27602-2889

Michael William Stark

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Tennille Jo Checkovich Esq.

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS, LLP

800 East Canal Street, P. O. Box 3916

Richmond, VA 23219

Tillman J. Breckenridge

Attorney at PIERCE BAINBRIDGE BECK PRICE & HECHT LLP

601 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, South Tower

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER filed updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/15/2020. Response brief due 07/15/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000710566] [20-1150] DL [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:04 AM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/21/2020. Response brief due 05/21/2020 Copies to all parties. [1000700254] [20-1150] AW [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:17 PM]

#12

(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1150] LHP [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:04 AM]

#11

(#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/08/2020. Response Brief due 05/08/2020 [20-1150] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 07:23 AM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew High. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000692279] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:25 PM]

#9

(#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:38 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000692197] [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:18 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael W. Stark for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000692189] [20-1150] Michael Stark [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:11 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tennille J. Checkovich for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000692183] [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:08 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mona Lisa Wallace for Andrew High. [1000692049] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:45 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Hughes for Andrew High. [1000692044] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:44 AM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tillman J. Breckenridge for Joyce McKiver, Delois Lewis, Daphne McKoy, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr., Tammy Lloyd, Deborah Johnson, Priscilla Dunham and Ethel Davis. [1000691772] [20-1150] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:08 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:15-cv-00013-BR. [20-1150] KH [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:00 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:15-cv-00013-BR. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1150] KH [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:56 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER filed updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/15/2020. Response brief due 07/15/2020. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Copies to all parties. [1000710566] [20-1150] DL [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/21/2020. Response brief due 05/21/2020 Copies to all parties. [1000700254] [20-1150] AW [Entered: 03/11/2020 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [20-1150] LHP [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/08/2020. Response Brief due 05/08/2020 [20-1150] DL [Entered: 02/28/2020 07:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew High. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000692279] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Murphy-Brown, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000692197] [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael W. Stark for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000692189] [20-1150] Michael Stark [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tennille J. Checkovich for Murphy-Brown, LLC. [1000692183] [20-1150] Tennille Checkovich [Entered: 02/27/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mona Lisa Wallace for Andrew High. [1000692049] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John S. Hughes for Andrew High. [1000692044] [20-1150] Mona Wallace [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Tillman J. Breckenridge for Joyce McKiver, Delois Lewis, Daphne McKoy, Alexandria McKoy, Antonio Kevin McKoy, Archie Wright, Jr., Tammy Lloyd, Deborah Johnson, Priscilla Dunham and Ethel Davis. [1000691772] [20-1150] Tillman Breckenridge [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 5:15-cv-00013-BR. [20-1150] KH [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:15-cv-00013-BR. Case manager: KHancock. [20-1150] KH [Entered: 02/13/2020 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tennille Jo Checkovich Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark E. Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stuart Alan Raphael